EP3086276 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING INFORMATION TO TEXTILE TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groz-Beckert KG Parkweg 2 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Svejda, Miroslav Färberstraße 14 DE - 72336 Balingen / DE | 02 /
Schöller, Eric Steinbusstraße 13/2 DE - 72459 Albstadt Pfeffingen / DE | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 15164302.0 | 20.04.2015 | [2016/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086276 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/04 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q50/04 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/06028 (KR);
G06K19/0723 (KR);
G06K7/1417 (US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q10/083 (US);
G06Q10/0832 (US);
G06Q10/0833 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] |
Former [2016/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERMITTLUNG VON INFORMATIONEN ZU TEXTILEN WERKZEUGEN | [2016/43] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING INFORMATION TO TEXTILE TOOLS | [2016/43] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS À DES OUTILS TEXTILES | [2016/43] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 14.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.11.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/37] | 25.07.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/37] | Appeal following examination | 22.01.2021 | Appeal received No. T0297/21 | 22.01.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 26.03.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.07.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008157933 (WINKLER STEVE [US]) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [I]CN104049615 (CHUNG CHARM TEXTILES LTD) [I] 1-16 * abstract * | by applicant | DE60214991T |