EP2949985 - ELEMENT FOR FORMING A SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adler, Matthias Hudlemstr. 17a 22159 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states La Rive Germany GmbH Pappelallee 28 22089 Hamburg / DE | [2017/16] |
Former [2015/49] | For all designated states Claßen, Björn Hohenesch 54 22765 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claßen, Björn Bahrenfelder Steindamm 91 22761 Hamburg / DE | [2017/16] |
Former [2015/49] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2015/49] | Application number, filing date | 15164469.7 | 21.04.2015 | [2015/49] | Priority number, date | DE201420102396U | 22.05.2014 Original published format: DE 202014102396 U | [2015/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2949985 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2949985 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16M13/02, A45C1/00, B62J99/00 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
F16M13/00 (EP,US);
B62J11/00 (EP,US);
F16M11/10 (EP);
F16M13/022 (EP);
A45F2200/0516 (EP);
A45F2200/0525 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2015/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEMENT ZUM BILDEN EINER HALTERUNG | [2015/49] | English: | ELEMENT FOR FORMING A SUPPORT | [2015/49] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DESTINÉ À FORMER UN SUPPORT | [2015/49] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 17.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2015 | AL | 10.05.2017 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | IT | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | MT | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | RS | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | SM | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.04.2015 | |
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 21.04.2015 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 10.05.2017 | |
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012091312 (BAKER GERALD HANK WILLIAM [CN]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * figures 19-24 *; | [XI] - Anonymous, "Finn. The universal smartphone mount for every bike.", (20131203), page 12PP, getfinn, URL: http://getfinn.com/, (20151015), XP002746637 [X] 1,2,4-10 * page 1 - page 8 * [I] 3 | [AP] - tweepy, "Dirt Cheap DIY Smartphone Bike Mount", (20140908), DotMana, URL: http://www.dotmana.com/weblog/2014/09/dirt-cheap-diy-smartphone-bike-mount/, (20151015), XP002746638 [AP] 10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE202012104592U | DE202012008050U | DE102013016045 |