EP2930242 - GENES ENCODING BIOFILM FORMATION INHIBITORY PROTEINS AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING L-LYSINE USING A BACTERIAL STRAIN WITH THE INACTIVATED GENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CJ Cheiljedang Corporation Dongho-ro 330 Ssangnim-dong Jung-gu Seoul 100-400 / KR | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ha, Un Hwan 603-901, 187, Noeundong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-770 / KR | 02 /
Kim, YongJae 95-18, Seongyeong-ro Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-846 / KR | 03 /
Lee, Jung Hoon 33, Nangye-ro 11-gil Jung-gu Seoul 100-871 / KR | 04 /
Shin, Hee Sung 106-103, 57, Deogyeong-daero 2077beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-908 / KR | 05 /
Moon, Jun Ok 102-807, 17, Woljeong-ro 9-gil Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-090 / KR | 06 /
Kim, Hyung Joon 103-1403, 343, Gyeongin-ro Guro-gu Seoul 152-795 / KR | 07 /
Lee, Kwang Ho 809, 28, Hwagok-ro 68-gil Gangseo-gu Seoul 157-840 / KR | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2015/42] | Andrews, Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15164488.7 | 13.10.2014 | [2015/42] | Priority number, date | KR20130122443 | 15.10.2013 Original published format: KR 20130122443 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2930242 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2930242 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/63, C07K14/34, C12N15/52 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
C12P13/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C07K14/34 (EP,CN,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/0014 (EP,US);
C12N9/1025 (EP,US);
C12Y104/99001 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] |
Former [2015/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GENE ZUR CODIERUNG VON BIOFILMBILDUNGSHEMMENDEN PROTEINEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON L-LYSIN MITTELS EINES BAKTERIELLEN STAMMS MIT DEN INAKTIVIERTEN GENEN | [2015/42] | English: | GENES ENCODING BIOFILM FORMATION INHIBITORY PROTEINS AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING L-LYSINE USING A BACTERIAL STRAIN WITH THE INACTIVATED GENES | [2015/42] | French: | GÈNES CODANT DES PROTÉINES D'INHIBITION DE LA FORMATION DE BIOFILM ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE L-LYSINE UTILISANT UNE SOUCHE BACTÉRIENNE AVEC LES GÈNES INACTIVÉS | [2015/42] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 11.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 27.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14188620.0 / EP2862932 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.11.2019 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | ES | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | IT | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | RS | 13.11.2019 | SE | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | NO | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 13.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3849250 (NAKAYAMA K, et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 36 - line 40 *; | [Y]EP1106693 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * claims 7-16 *; | [Y]EP1108790 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * claims 51, 62, 64; sequence 3333 *; | [X]DE10128510 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1 * page 12, paragraph 50; claim 1; sequence 2069 *; | [Y]WO2012008810 (CJ CHEILJEDANG CORP [KR], et al) [Y] 1,2 * claims 1-10 *; | [Y]EP2453006 (CJ CHEILJEDANG CORP [KR]) [Y] 1,2* claims 1-8 *; | [T] - SEOK HYUN PARK ET AL, "Metabolic engineering of Corynebacterium glutamicum for L-arginine production", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20140805), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/ncomms5618, XP055197630 [T] * supplementary data 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms5618 | [X] - KYUNG KI-CHEON ET AL., "Development of L-Lysine Producing Strains by Intergeneric Protoplast Fusion of Brevibacterium flavum and Corynebacterium glutamicum", KOR. J. APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOENG., (19850813), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 279 - 283, XP002741275 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | KR0073610B | KR100924065B | KR20120007965 | KR101134700B | - BINDER ET AL., GENOME BIOLOGY, (2012), vol. 13, page R40 | - MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 55, no. 2, pages 368 - 380 | - VAN DER REST ET AL., APPL MICROBIOL BIOTECHNOL, (1999), vol. 52, pages 541 - 545 | - CAN. J. MICROBIOL., (1977), vol. 23, pages 1 - 6 |