EP2937563 - WIND TURBINE SHADOW FLICKER PROTECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2016/50] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Rong 1800 Cai Lun Road Zhang-Jiang Hi Tech Park 201203 Shanghai / CN | 02 /
LIU, Shijiang 1800 Cai Lun Road Zhang-Jiang Hi Tech Park Shanghai / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Chenggang 1800 Cai Lun Road Zhang-Jiang Hi Tech Park Shanghai / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Weiguo 1800 Cai Lun Road Zhang-Jiang Hi Tech Park Shanghai / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Qi 1800 Cai Lun Road Zhang-Jiang Hi Tech Park Shanghai / CN | 06 /
RIEKEN, Stefan Holsterfeld 16 48499 Salzbergen / DE | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 15164631.2 | 22.04.2015 | [2015/44] | Priority number, date | US201414259220 | 23.04.2014 Original published format: US201414259220 | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2937563 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2937563 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F03D80/20, F03D7/00, G01J1/02, G01J1/04, G01J1/42 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
F03D7/00 (EP,US);
F03D80/20 (EP,US);
G01J1/0271 (EP,US);
G01J1/0403 (EP,US);
G01J1/0407 (EP,US);
G01J1/0414 (EP);
G01J1/42 (EP,US);
F05B2270/19 (EP,US);
F05B2270/804 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | F03D11/00, G01J1/02, G01J1/04, G01J1/42, F03D7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] |
Former [2015/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHATTENSCHLAGSCHUTZSYSTEM EINER WINDTURBINE | [2015/44] | English: | WIND TURBINE SHADOW FLICKER PROTECTION SYSTEM | [2015/44] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION CONTRE L'ALTERNANCE OMBRE/SOLEIL D'UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2015/44] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 19.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2015 | AL | 14.12.2016 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | IT | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | NL | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | IE | 22.04.2017 | LU | 22.04.2017 | MT | 22.04.2017 | FR | 02.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 22.04.2015 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
TR | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 22.04.2017 | ||
LU | 22.04.2017 | ||
MT | 22.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 22.04.2015 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 22.04.2017 | ||
LU | 22.04.2017 | ||
MT | 22.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 22.04.2015 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 22.04.2017 | ||
LU | 22.04.2017 | ||
MT | 22.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.04.2015 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 22.04.2017 | ||
LU | 22.04.2017 | ||
MT | 22.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 22.04.2017 | ||
LU | 22.04.2017 | ||
MT | 22.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 22.04.2017 | ||
LU | 22.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 22.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2004360508 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 13 * figure 1A * * the whole document * [A] 1,11; | [A]US2006267347 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1,11,13 * figures 1, 2 ** paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] *; | [XAI]EP2554840 (ALSTOM WIND SLU [ES]) [X] 1-6,8-11,13-15 * figures 1, 2a, 2b, 4a, 4b, 5a, 5b, 6 * [A] 12 [I] 7 |