EP2937453 - ELASTIC WARP KNITTED FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [2021/19] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Fibers Corporation 3-23 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akita Shoichi 1-105, Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP | [2021/24] |
Former [2015/44] | 01 /
Akita, Shoichi 1-105, Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/24] |
Former [2015/44] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 15164696.5 | 30.08.2010 | [2015/44] | Priority number, date | JP20090277625 | 07.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009277625 | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2937453 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2937453 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D04B21/18 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
D04B21/18 (EP,US);
Y10T442/413 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] |
Former [2015/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELASTISCHER KETTENGEWIRKSTOFF | [2015/44] | English: | ELASTIC WARP KNITTED FABRIC | [2015/44] | French: | TISSU ÉLASTIQUE À MAILLES BLOQUÉES | [2015/44] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10835750.0 / EP2511405 | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2010 | AL | 16.06.2021 | AT | 16.06.2021 | CY | 16.06.2021 | CZ | 16.06.2021 | DK | 16.06.2021 | EE | 16.06.2021 | ES | 16.06.2021 | FI | 16.06.2021 | HR | 16.06.2021 | IT | 16.06.2021 | LT | 16.06.2021 | LV | 16.06.2021 | MC | 16.06.2021 | MK | 16.06.2021 | MT | 16.06.2021 | NL | 16.06.2021 | PL | 16.06.2021 | RO | 16.06.2021 | SE | 16.06.2021 | SI | 16.06.2021 | SK | 16.06.2021 | SM | 16.06.2021 | TR | 16.06.2021 | IE | 30.08.2021 | LU | 30.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | BG | 16.09.2021 | NO | 16.09.2021 | GR | 17.09.2021 | IS | 16.10.2021 | PT | 18.10.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 30.08.2010 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
MK | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
TR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.08.2010 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
MK | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 30.08.2010 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4649722 (GAJJAR BHARAT J [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 39 - column 3, line 21; figure 1G; examples 4955-68I; claim 1; tables 1, 2 *; | [IA]EP1281798 (IND CENTENARI E ZINELLI SPA [IT]) [I] 1,4 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 36] - [0041]; figure 9; claims 2, 3, 5 * [A] 5; | [A]US3910075 (HOLLIDAY BETTIE E) [A] 3 * column 5, line 37 - column 8, line 37; figures 1-4; claims 2-8, 15 *; | [A]US3961500 (BRALEY ROBERT L, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 22-30 * | Examination | EP0249312 | DE4119048 | EP0826809 | by applicant | JPH0770894 | JPH062252 | JP3897150B |