EP3086284 - CAMERA EXTRINSIC PARAMETERS ESTIMATION FROM IMAGE LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Application Solutions (Electronics and Vision) Limited The Riverside Centre Railway Lane Lewes, East Sussex BN7 2 AQ / GB | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guerreiro, Rui Coventry Street 43A Brighton BN1 5PP / GB | 02 /
Panakos, Andreas 44 Stirling Place Hove, BN3 3YU / GB | 03 /
Silva, Carlos Upperton Road Flat 13, Hadley House Eastbourne, BN21 1EL / GB | 04 /
Yadav, Dev 21 Pellbrook Road Lewes, BN7 2TF / GB | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Büchner, Jörg Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstr. 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 15164760.9 | 23.04.2015 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086284 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
G06T7/80 (EP,KR,US);
G06V20/56 (US);
G06T2207/20061 (KR);
G06T2207/30252 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] |
Former [2016/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHÄTZUNG EXTRINSISCHER KAMERAPARAMETER AUSGEHEND VON BILDLINIEN | [2016/43] | English: | CAMERA EXTRINSIC PARAMETERS ESTIMATION FROM IMAGE LINES | [2016/43] | French: | ESTIMATION DE PARAMÈTRES DE CAMÉRA EXTRINSÈQUES PROVENANT DE LIGNES D'IMAGE | [2016/43] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/18] | 22.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.12.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2523163 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]) [A] 1-4,7-15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0065] * * figures 2-3 *; | [A]EP2597614 (CLARION CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,7-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0061] *; | [XI] - SHIGANG LI ET AL, "Easy Calibration of a Blind-Spot-Free Fisheye Camera System Using a Scene of a Parking Space", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20110301), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TITS.2010.2085435, ISSN 1524-9050, pages 232 - 242, XP011348841 [X] 1-5,7,8,10-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0236] - paragraph [0238]; figures 6,8-10 * [I] 6,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TITS.2010.2085435 | [A] - SHIGANG LI ET AL, "Estimating camera pose from H-pattern of parking lot", 2010 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION : ICRA 2010 ; ANCHORAGE, ALASKA, USA, 3 - 8 MAY 2010, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100503), ISBN 978-1-4244-5038-1, pages 3954 - 3959, XP031743339 [A] 1-4,7-15 * abstract * * page 3956 - page 3957; figures 5-6 * | [A] - HERNANDEZ DANILO CACERES ET AL, "Vision-based heading angle estimation for an autonomous mobile robots navigation", 2014 IEEE 23RD INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS (ISIE), IEEE, (20140601), doi:10.1109/ISIE.2014.6864917, pages 1967 - 1972, XP032623980 [A] 5,6 * abstract * * page 1970; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISIE.2014.6864917 | [A] - DIAS J ET AL, "Vision and inertial sensor cooperation using gravity as a vertical reference", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, USA, (20031201), vol. 25, no. 12, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2003.1251152, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 1597 - 1608, XP011103927 [A] 5,6 * page 1600 - page 1601 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2003.1251152 | [A] - ZHONGPING LIU ET AL, "Viewing transform of image based on vanishing point", INTELLIGENT COMPUTING AND INTEGRATED SYSTEMS (ICISS), 2010 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101022), doi:10.1109/ICISS.2010.5656817, ISBN 978-1-4244-6834-8, pages 180 - 184, XP031817491 [A] 5,6 * abstract * * page 181 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICISS.2010.5656817 | by applicant | - JOAO P. BARRETO, "A Unifying Geometric Representation for Central Projection Systems", COMPUTER VISION AND IMAGE UNDERSTANDING, (200609), vol. 103, no. 3, pages 207 - 217 | - P. PALMER; A. TAI, "An Optimised Vanishing Point Detector", BRITISH MACH. VIS. CONF., (1993), pages 529 - 538 |