EP2950304 - TECHNIQUES FOR ARRANGING STAGE ELEMENTS ON A STAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman International Industries, Incorporated 400 Atlantic Street, 15th Floor Stamford, CT 06901 / US | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTI, Stefan c/o Harman International Industries, Inc. 400 Atlantic Street 15th Floor Stamford, CT Connecticut 06901 / US | 02 /
DI CENSO, Davide c/o Harman International Industries, Inc. 400 Atlantic Street 15th Floor Stamford, CT Connecticut 06901 / US | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [2021/42] |
Former [2015/49] | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15165829.1 | 30.04.2015 | [2015/49] | Priority number, date | US201414289515 | 28.05.2014 Original published format: US201414289515 | [2015/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2950304 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2950304 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/00, H04R5/02, H04R5/04, H04R29/00 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
H04R5/02 (EP,US);
G05D3/00 (US);
G05B15/02 (US);
H04R29/007 (EP,US);
H04S7/30 (US);
H04S7/302 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] |
Former [2015/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUM ANORDNEN VON BÜHNENELEMENTEN AUF EINER BÜHNE | [2015/49] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR ARRANGING STAGE ELEMENTS ON A STAGE | [2015/49] | French: | TECHNIQUES POUR L'AGENCEMENT D'ÉLÉMENTS D'UNE SCÈNE SUR UNE SCÈNE | [2020/08] |
Former [2015/49] | TECHNIQUES POUR L'AGENCEMENT D'ÉLÉMENTS D'ÉTAGE SUR UN ÉTAGE | Examination procedure | 02.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 22.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.09.2020 | 22.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 23.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2015 | AL | 20.10.2021 | AT | 20.10.2021 | CY | 20.10.2021 | CZ | 20.10.2021 | DK | 20.10.2021 | EE | 20.10.2021 | ES | 20.10.2021 | FI | 20.10.2021 | HR | 20.10.2021 | IT | 20.10.2021 | LT | 20.10.2021 | LV | 20.10.2021 | MC | 20.10.2021 | MK | 20.10.2021 | MT | 20.10.2021 | NL | 20.10.2021 | PL | 20.10.2021 | RO | 20.10.2021 | RS | 20.10.2021 | SE | 20.10.2021 | SI | 20.10.2021 | SK | 20.10.2021 | SM | 20.10.2021 | TR | 20.10.2021 | BG | 20.01.2022 | NO | 20.01.2022 | GR | 21.01.2022 | IS | 20.02.2022 | PT | 21.02.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | FR | 30.04.2022 | IE | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | LU | 30.04.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 30.04.2015 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
MK | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
TR | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.04.2015 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
MK | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 30.04.2015 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.04.2015 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 20.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0159813 (WARNER MUSIC GROUP INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 7, line 26 - page 8, paragraph 23; figure 1 * * page 10, line 18 - page 14, line 9; figures 4, 5, 9 *; | [A]WO2004030403 (TSAKIRIS VASILIS [GR]) [A] 1-15* page 1, line 45 - page 4, line 3 *; | [XI]KR20050059840 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-15; | [I]KR101100165B (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0051] * * figures 1-3 * | Examination | - Gareth Conner, "Scenic Automation: Let's Move Stuff", (20140424), URL: https://americantheatrewing.org/how-it-works/scenic-automation-lets-move-stuff-pt1/, (20201006), XP055737296 | - Nick Farwell, "ACT Theatre using Creative Conners scenic automation", (20110331), URL: https://vimeo.com/21788246, (20201006), XP055737320 | - Creative Conners, "mtcautomation", Youtube, (20130207), page 2 pp., URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=GACnaEQbQM4&feature=emb_title, (20201008), XP054980969 |