EP2918324 - METHOD FOR PURIFICATION OF MICAFUNGIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xellia Pharmaceuticals ApS Dalslandsgade 11 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AASSVEEN, Lene Hermann Foss gate 24 N-0171 OSLO / NO | 02 /
DALE, Eli Karin Mollefaret 44A N-0750 OSLO / NO | 03 /
HANSEN, Espen Fridtjof Slalåmveien 80B N-3050 LOMMEDALEN / NO | 04 /
MELDAHL EIDE, Kjersti Ekebergveien 5D 0192 OSLO / NO | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2015/38] | Application number, filing date | 15165834.1 | 13.04.2012 | [2015/38] | Priority number, date | US201161477190P | 20.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161477190 P | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2918324 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/32, A61K31/4164, C07K7/56 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
C07K1/14 (KR);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K38/12 (KR);
B01D15/32 (KR);
B01D15/327 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2015/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON MICAFUNGIN | [2015/38] | English: | METHOD FOR PURIFICATION OF MICAFUNGIN | [2015/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE MICAFONGINE | [2015/38] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/09] | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12713998.8 / EP2699327 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5202309 (SCHWARTZ ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 68 *; | [A]US6506726 (DOBBINS JOHN ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 32 - line 40 * * column 5, line 37 - line 55 * * example - *; | [A]EP2236513 (CADILA HEALTHCARE LTD [IN]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] *; | [AP]WO2012041801 (DSM SINOCHEM PHARM NL BV [NL], et al) [AP] 1-11 * page 4, line 10 - line 28 * * page 5, line 1 - line 23 * * page 6, line 19 - line 25 * * example 2 *; | [AP]WO2012041218 (SHANGHAI TECHWELL BIOPHARM CO [CN], et al) [AP] 1-11 * abstract *; | [E]EP2699327 (XELLIA PHARMACEUTICALS APS [DK]) [E] 1-11* claim - * | by applicant | US6107458 | US6170458 | US7199248 | - OHIGASHI ET AL., "Process Development of Micafungin, a Novel Lipopeptide Antifungal Agent", JOURNAL OF SYNTHETIC ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, JAPAN, (200612), vol. 64, no. 12, doi:doi:10.5059/yukigoseikyokaishi.64.1294, XP007920568 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5059/yukigoseikyokaishi.64.1294 |