EP2942618 - SPECTRO-SENSOR AND SPECTROMETER EMPLOYING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/46] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Seunghoon c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do 443-803 / KR | 02 /
Park, Hongkyu c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do 443-803 / KR | 03 /
Lee, Moonsook c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do 443-803 / KR | 04 /
Cho, Seongho c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do 443-803 / KR | [2015/46] | Representative(s) | Portch, Daniel, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Portch, Daniel, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2015/46] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15166742.5 | 07.05.2015 | [2015/46] | Priority number, date | KR20140055755 | 09.05.2014 Original published format: KR 20140055755 | KR20140100697 | 05.08.2014 Original published format: KR 20140100697 | [2015/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2942618 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2942618 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/552, B82Y15/00, B82Y20/00, B82Y30/00, G01J3/44, G01N21/64, G01N21/65, G01N33/58, G01N21/25, G01J3/36 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
G01J3/44 (EP,US);
G01J3/28 (US);
B82Y15/00 (US);
G01J3/36 (EP,US);
G01J3/4412 (US);
G01N21/554 (EP,US);
G01N21/648 (EP,US);
G01N21/658 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/46] | G01N21/552, B82Y15/00, B82Y20/00, B82Y30/00, G01J3/44, G01N21/64, G01N21/65, G01N33/58, G01N21/25 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] |
Former [2015/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPECTRO-SENSOR UND SPEKTROMETER DAMIT | [2015/46] | English: | SPECTRO-SENSOR AND SPECTROMETER EMPLOYING THE SAME | [2015/46] | French: | CAPTEUR SPECTRAL ET SPECTROMÈTRE UTILISANT CELUI-CI | [2015/46] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 20.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2015 | AL | 12.07.2017 | AT | 12.07.2017 | CY | 12.07.2017 | CZ | 12.07.2017 | DK | 12.07.2017 | EE | 12.07.2017 | ES | 12.07.2017 | FI | 12.07.2017 | HR | 12.07.2017 | IT | 12.07.2017 | LT | 12.07.2017 | LV | 12.07.2017 | MC | 12.07.2017 | MK | 12.07.2017 | NL | 12.07.2017 | PL | 12.07.2017 | PT | 12.07.2017 | RO | 12.07.2017 | RS | 12.07.2017 | SE | 12.07.2017 | SI | 12.07.2017 | SK | 12.07.2017 | SM | 12.07.2017 | TR | 12.07.2017 | BG | 12.10.2017 | NO | 12.10.2017 | GR | 13.10.2017 | IS | 12.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.05.2015 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.05.2015 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 12.07.2017 | |
NO | 12.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2012129269 (CHOI BYUNG IL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,10,12-14 * figures 1-3, 8A, 8B, 25 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0167] * [Y] 4 [I] 5,7-9,11,15; | [Y]US2012170097 (HAN SEUNG-HOON [KR], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0081]; figures 3,4 ** paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0111] * |