EP2941959 - AUTOMATED CLEANING EQUIPMENT FOR CURED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Of Course Solutions, S.L. Anselm Clavé 3, Esc. b, bxos. 2ª 17800 Olot / ES | [2015/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morejón Arjona, Juan c/o Of Course Solutions, S.L. Anselm Clavé 3, Esc. b, bxos. 2ª 17800 Olot / ES | [2015/46] | Representative(s) | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P Edifici PRISMA Av. Diagonal núm. 611-613, Planta 2 08028 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/46] | Morgades y Manonelles, Juan Antonio C/ Rector Ubach, 37-39, bj. 2a 08021 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 15166873.8 | 08.05.2015 | [2015/46] | Priority number, date | ES20140030683 | 09.05.2014 Original published format: ES 201430683 | [2015/46] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2941959 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A22C17/00, A22C17/08 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
A22C17/0073 (EP);
A22C17/08 (EP,ES)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] | Extension states | BA | 08.05.2015 | ME | 08.05.2015 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE REINIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR GEHÄRTETE PRODUKTE | [2015/46] | English: | AUTOMATED CLEANING EQUIPMENT FOR CURED PRODUCTS | [2015/46] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT DE NETTOYAGE AUTOMATISÉ POUR PRODUITS DURCIS | [2015/46] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 13.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 08.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]ES2363624 (OF COURSE SOLUTIONS S L [ES]) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]GB942182 (UNILEVER LTD) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | ES20110030686 |