EP3090684 - PEDOMETER AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING MOTION DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd. Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2016/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fasel, Benedikt Chemin des Ramiers 20 1022 Chavannes / CH | 02 /
Duc, Cyntia Avenue de Mores 30 1004 Lausanne / CH | 03 /
Dadashi, Farzin Rue du Maupas 42C 1004 Lausanne / CH | 04 /
Aminian, Kamiar Gregnolet 5 1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Goulette, Ludivine, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Gilligmann, Benoît Philippe, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 15167028.8 | 08.05.2015 | [2016/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3090684 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/11, G01C22/00 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
A61B5/1118 (EP);
A61B5/112 (EP);
A61B5/1123 (EP);
G01C22/006 (EP);
A61B5/681 (EP);
G06F2218/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRITTZÄHLER UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON BEWEGUNGSDATEN | [2016/45] | English: | PEDOMETER AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING MOTION DATA | [2016/45] | French: | PODOMÈTRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE DONNÉES DE MOUVEMENT | [2016/45] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 16.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008214360 (STIRLING ROSS G [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,12-14,16 * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0105] *; | [XYI]US2013191034 (WEAST AARON B [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,12-14,16 * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0109] * * figure 9 * [Y] 7-11 [I] 2; | [Y]WO2014109982 (VALENCELL INC [US]) [Y] 7-11 * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 27 * * page 10, line 4 - line 5 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2014257766 (PODURI SAMEERA [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,15 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059] * * figure 6 *; | [XYI]US2014278139 (HONG JUNG OOK [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12-14,16 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0127] * [Y] 5,6,15 [I] 4; | [X]WO2015066718 (BASIS SCIENCE INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A] - VALÉRIE RENAUDIN ET AL, "Step Length Estimation Using Handheld Inertial Sensors", SENSORS, CH, (20121225), vol. 12, no. 12, doi:10.3390/s120708507, ISSN 1424-8220, pages 8507 - 8525, XP055227893 [A] 7-11 * Sections 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s120708507 | [A] - MANNINI A ET AL, "On-line classification of human activity and estimation of walk-run speed from acceleration data using support vector machines", ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY,EMBC, 2011 ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE, IEEE, (20110830), doi:10.1109/IEMBS.2011.6090896, ISBN 978-1-4244-4121-1, pages 3302 - 3305, XP032319466 [A] 9-11 * Section II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2011.6090896 | [A] - DOVAL B ET AL, "Fundamental frequency estimation and tracking using maximum likelihood harmonic matching and HMMs", 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). ORLANDO, FL, MAY 13 - 17, 2002; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP)], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (19930427), doi:10.1109/ICASSP.1993.319095, ISBN 978-0-7803-7402-7, pages 221 - 224vol.1, XP031983967 [A] 7-11 * Section "Theory" * * Section "Implementation" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1993.319095 | by applicant | US2013085711 |