EP2942061 - IGE CH3 PEPTIDE VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Vaccines LLC 235 East, 42nd Street New York NY 10017-5755 / US | [2015/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Champion, Brian, Robert Pfizer Global Research and Development 10777 Science Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
Stead, David, Robert Pfizer Global Research and Development 10777 Science Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
Wright, Paul, Andrew Pfizer Global Research and Development 10777 Science Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2015/46] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2015/46] | Application number, filing date | 15167332.4 | 01.06.2011 | [2015/46] | Priority number, date | US20100352127P | 07.06.2010 Original published format: US 352127 P | [2015/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2942061 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2942061 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
A61K39/0005 (EP,US);
C07K17/06 (US);
A61K39/44 (US);
A61K47/54 (EP,US);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07K16/4291 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55561 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6037 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6075 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6081 (EP,US);
A61K2039/70 (EP,US);
A61K2300/00 (US);
A61K38/10 (EP,US);
A61K39/385 (US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
C07K2317/526 (EP,US);
C07K2317/528 (EP,US);
C07K2319/55 (EP,US);
C07K4/12 (US);
C07K7/08 (US);
Y10S424/805 (EP,US);
Y10S424/81 (EP,US);
Y10S530/806 (EP,US);
Y10S530/862 (EP,US);
Y10S530/866 (EP,US);
Y10S530/868 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2015/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IGE-CH3-PEPTIDIMPFSTOFF | [2015/46] | English: | IGE CH3 PEPTIDE VACCINE | [2015/46] | French: | VACCIN PEPTIDIQUE IGE CH3 | [2015/46] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/34] | 13.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11728062.8 / EP2575868 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0050461 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) [I] 1-20 * page 26, lines 13, 14; table 4; sequence 4 *; | [A]US2005250934 (WANG CHANG Y [US], et al) [A] 1-20* examples 1-6; sequences 41,50,51,58 *; | [XP]WO2010067286 (PFIZER VACCINES LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1-20 * page 18, column 36 - page 19, column 16; examples 1-12; claims 1-111 *; | [I] - WANG C Y ET AL, "Synthetic IgE peptide vaccine for immunotherapy of allergy", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, (20030402), vol. 21, no. 15, doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(02)00732-6, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1580 - 1590, XP004413567 [I] 1-20 * figures 1-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(02)00732-6 | [A] - Z. PENG ET AL, "Novel IgE peptide-based vaccine prevents the increase of IgE and down-regulates elevated IgE in rodents", CLINICAL & EXPERIMENTAL ALLERGY, (20070701), vol. 37, no. 7, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2222.2007.02741.x, ISSN 0954-7894, pages 1040 - 1048, XP055003911 [A] 1-20 * figures 1-4; tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2222.2007.02741.x | [A] - HANS L SPIEGELBERG ET AL, "Primary and Secondary Immune Response to Human IgE by Rabbits Immunized With Synthetic IgE Peptides", 19870101, (19870101), vol. 3988, no. 1, pages 251 - 261, XP007919172 [A] 1-20 * figures 1-9; table 1 * | by applicant | EP0092574 | US4469863 | GB2220221 | WO9003184 | WO9014837 | US5023243 | EP0689454 | WO9602555 | WO9611711 | EP0735898 | EP0761231 | US5614382 | EP0835318 | WO9816247 | WO9818810 | WO9836772 | EP0594610 | WO9837919 | WO9840100 | WO9852581 | WO9855495 | WO9857659 | WO9911241 | WO9944636 | WO9952549 | WO0007621 | WO0023105 | WO0041720 | WO0048630 | WO0062800 | US6194388 | US6207646 | WO0121207 | WO0121152 | WO0122990 | US6214806 | US6218371 | US6239116 | US6339068 | WO0205690 | WO03024480 | WO03024481 | WO2006134423 | WO2007026190 | WO2007095316 | - PRESTA ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (19930901), vol. 151, no. 5, pages 2623 - 32 | - PEARSON, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 183, pages 63 - 98 | - PEARSON, METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2000), vol. 132, pages 185 - 219 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 402 | - UCHIDA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1973), vol. 218, pages 3838 - 3844 | - UCHIDA, T. ET AL., NATURE NEW BIOLOGY, (1971), vol. 233, pages 8 - 11 | - D. ANDREAU, Methods in Molecular Biology, Vol. 35: Peptide Synthesis Protocols, vol. 35, pages 91 - 171 | - SJOLANDER ET AL., J. LEUKOCYTE BIOL., (1998), vol. 64, page 713 | - KRIEG, VACCINE, (2000), vol. 19, pages 618 - 622 | - KRIEG, CURR OPIN MOL THER, (2001), vol. 3, pages 15 - 24 | - ROMAN ET AL., NAT. MED., (1997), vol. 3, pages 849 - 854 | - WEINER ET AL., PNAS USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 10833 - 10837 | - DAVIS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 160, pages 870 - 876 | - CHU, J. EXP.MED, (1997), vol. 186, pages 1623 - 1631 | - LIPFORD ET AL., EAR. J. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 27, pages 2340 - 2344 | - MOLDOVEAMI, VACCINE, (1988), vol. 16, pages 1216 - 1224 | - KRIEG ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 374, pages 546 - 549 | - KLINMAN ET AL., PNAS USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 2879 - 2883 | - BALLAS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 157, pages 1840 - 1845 | - COWDERY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 156, pages 4570 - 4575 | - HALPERN ET AL., CELL IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 167, pages 72 - 78 | - YAMAMOTO ET AL., JPN. J. CANCER RES., (1988), vol. 79, pages 866 - 873 | - STACEY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 157, pages 2116 - 2122 | - MESSINA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1991), vol. 147, pages 1759 - 1764 | - YI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 157, pages 4918 - 4925 | - YI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 157, pages 5394 - 5402 | - YI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 160, pages 4755 - 4761 | - YI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 160, pages 5898 - 5906 | - KANZLER ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2007), vol. 13, pages 1552 - 9 | - YAMAMOTO S ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 148, pages 4072 - 6 | - KRIEG AM ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 374, pages 546 - 9 | - BALLAS ZK ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 157, pages 1840 - 5 | - YAMAMOTO S ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 148, pages 4072 - 6 | - KRIEG AM ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SD USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 12631 - 12636 | - UHLMANN E ET AL., CHEM REV, (1990), vol. 90, page 544 | - GOODCHILD J, BIOCONJUGATE CHEM, (1990), vol. 1, page 165 | - UHLMANN E. ET AL., CHEM. REV., (1990), vol. 90, page 543 | - CROOKE, S.T. ET AL., ANNU. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL., (1996), vol. 36, pages 107 - 129 | - HUNZIKER J. ET AL., MOD. SYNTH. METHODS, (1995), vol. 7, pages 331 - 417 | - WURZBURG BA ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2000), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 375 - 85 | - GARMAN SC ET AL., NATURE, (19991220), vol. 406, no. 6793, pages 259 - 66 | - LLOYD C ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 166, pages 2033 - 2040 | - COYLE A ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1996), vol. 183, pages 1303 - 1310 | - GARMAN ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 406, pages 259 - 266 | - SPATH ET AL., HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1998), vol. 81, pages 1726 - 1738 | WO1995US01570 | WO1997US19791 | US20020224523 | EP20050105513 |