EP2947272 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE STATOR VANE BAFFLE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2015/48] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHIGLIOTTY, Jaime G. 726 Carr. Boqueron Cabo Rojo 00623 / PR | 02 /
DEVORE, Matthew A. 110 Skyview Drive Cromwell, CT Connecticut 06416 / US | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/48] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15167634.3 | 13.05.2015 | [2015/48] | Priority number, date | US201462001939P | 22.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462001939 P | [2015/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2947272 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D9/04 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
F01D9/041 (EP,US);
F01D5/189 (EP,US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/13 (US);
F05D2230/14 (US);
F05D2240/126 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (US);
F05D2260/205 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2015/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASTURBINEN MIT STATORSCHAUFEL MIT KÜHLEINSATZ | [2015/48] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE STATOR VANE BAFFLE ARRANGEMENT | [2015/48] | French: | AUBE DE STATOR DE MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ AVEC DÉFLECTEUR | [2015/48] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 24.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 21.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1101901 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 4] , [0006] , [0007] * * paragraphs [0015] , [0 16] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-4; claims 1,2, 6-8, 12,14, 15, 18,19, 27 *; | [X]EP0416542 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * column 4, line 8 - column 10, line 3; figures 1-3; claims 1,3, 12 *; | [XI]EP2233694 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-12,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 16] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-3; claim 1 * [I] 13,14 |