EP2952892 - SENSOR ELEMENT, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SENSOR ELEMENT, AND SENSOR CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurata, Yuji c/o ARKRAY, Inc. Kyoto Laboratory Yousuien-nai, 59, Gansuin-cho, Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto, 602-0008 / JP | 02 /
Kaneda, Hisashi c/o ARKRAY, Inc. Kyoto Laboratory Yousuien-nai, 59, Gansuin-cho, Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto, 602-0008 / JP | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15167667.3 | 13.05.2015 | [2015/50] | Priority number, date | JP20140099807 | 13.05.2014 Original published format: JP 2014099807 | JP20150078424 | 07.04.2015 Original published format: JP 2015078424 | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2952892 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2952892 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/48764 (EP,US);
B01L3/50 (US);
B32B37/22 (US);
B32B38/0004 (US);
C12Q1/54 (US);
B01L2200/10 (US);
B01L2200/12 (US);
B01L2300/0609 (US);
B01L2300/0663 (US);
B01L2300/0803 (US);
B01L2300/0819 (US);
B01L2300/0887 (US);
B01L2300/16 (US);
B01L2300/161 (US);
B32B2535/00 (US);
Y10T156/1082 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] |
Former [2015/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORELEMENT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SENSORELEMENTS UND SENSORKASSETTE | [2015/50] | English: | SENSOR ELEMENT, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SENSOR ELEMENT, AND SENSOR CARTRIDGE | [2015/50] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CAPTEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE CAPTEUR ET CARTOUCHE DE CAPTEUR | [2015/50] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009263854 (JACONO BRUCE [US], et al) [Y] 3,6 * paragraph [0125] *; | [X]US2012094369 (JACKSON JAMES RICHARD [GB], et al) [X] 1* paragraphs [0067] - [0070]; figures 4a,4b *; | [XY]WO2013038691 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 7,9,10 * [Y] 3,6 | by applicant | JP2011508872 | JP5289666B |