EP3096389 - AN APPARATUS AND ASSOCIATED METHODS FOR ELECTRICAL STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2016/47] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wei, Di 1 Pelham Court Cambridge, CB4 3TD / GB | 02 /
Zarra, Salvatore 62A Canterbury Street Cambridge, CB4 3 QF / GB | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 15167921.4 | 18.05.2015 | [2016/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096389 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/36, C01B31/04, G01N27/26, H01G11/32, H01G11/54, H01M6/14, H01M6/22, H01M6/32, H01M6/40 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
H01G11/28 (EP,US);
H01G11/32 (EP,US);
H01G11/54 (EP,US);
H01G11/56 (EP,US);
H01M10/36 (EP,US);
H01M6/14 (EP,US);
H01M6/22 (EP,US);
H01M6/32 (EP,US);
H01M6/40 (EP,US);
H01M2220/30 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0022 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0085 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2016/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTRISCHEN SPEICHERUNG | [2016/47] | English: | AN APPARATUS AND ASSOCIATED METHODS FOR ELECTRICAL STORAGE | [2016/47] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS DE STOCKAGE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2016/47] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 10.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013182373 (YU JIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0018] , [0026] - [0039] * * claim - *; | [A]US2014315096 (BORGES RAQUEL SILVEIRA [BR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0026] , [0068] , [0074] , [0084] , [0085] , [0087] , [0097] , [0099] * * claims 1-12, 15-26,28,33-36 * * figures 1,2B,15A,15B *; | [A]WO2014188059 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0035] - [0053] - [0058] ** figures 3,11 * |