EP3096542 - METHOD FOR IMPROVED HANDLING OF EMERGENCY CALLS OF A USER EQUIPMENT BEING CONNECTED TO A WIRELESS ACCESS POINT, WHILE INITIATING AN EMERGENCY CALL, SYSTEM FOR IMPROVED HANDLING OF EMERGENCY CALLS, MOBILE COMMUNICATION NETWORK FOR IMPROVED HANDLING OF EMERGENCY CALLS, USER EQUIPMENT, WIRELESS ACCESS POINT, PROGRAM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2016/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Melander, Mari An der Windmühle 4 53111 Bonn / DE | 02 /
Ververgaert, Rene Waldburg Str. 50 53177 Bonn / DE | 03 /
Debelts, Holger Paulusstr. 19 53227 Bonn / DE | 04 /
Schweflinghaus, Georg Im Stebich 22 53639 Königswinter / DE | 05 /
Nenner, Karl-Heinz Kolpingweg 9 53332 Bornheim / DE | 06 /
Zarri, Michele 74a Sandringham Road London, NW2 5EN / GB | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Schwöbel, Thilo K., et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2023/32] |
Former [2016/47] | Schwöbel, Thilo K., et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 15168026.1 | 18.05.2015 | [2016/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096542 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3096542 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/90, H04W76/16, H04W76/50, H04W36/08, H04W36/14 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,US);
H04W36/14 (EP,US);
H04W76/16 (EP,US);
H04W76/50 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/16 (EP,US);
H04M2242/04 (EP,US);
H04W36/16 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/16 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/47] | H04W4/22, H04W76/00, H04W36/08, H04W36/14, // H04W84/12, H04W84/04, H04W88/02, H04W88/08, H04L12/46, H04L29/06, H04W36/16, H04W92/10, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2016/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN HANDHABUNG VON NOTRUFEN EINES BENUTZERGERÄTS, DAS BEI DER INITIIERUNG EINES NOTRUFS MIT EINEM DRAHTLOSEN ZUGANGSPUNKT VERBUNDEN IST, SYSTEM ZUR VERBESSERTEN HANDHABUNG VON NOTRUFEN, MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK FÜR VERBESSERTE HANDHABUNG VON NOTRUFEN, BENUTZERGERÄT, DRAHTLOSER ZUGANGSPUNKT, PROGRAMM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2016/47] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVED HANDLING OF EMERGENCY CALLS OF A USER EQUIPMENT BEING CONNECTED TO A WIRELESS ACCESS POINT, WHILE INITIATING AN EMERGENCY CALL, SYSTEM FOR IMPROVED HANDLING OF EMERGENCY CALLS, MOBILE COMMUNICATION NETWORK FOR IMPROVED HANDLING OF EMERGENCY CALLS, USER EQUIPMENT, WIRELESS ACCESS POINT, PROGRAM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2016/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR TRAITEMENT AMÉLIORÉ DES APPELS D'URGENCE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ÉTANT RELIÉ À UN POINT D'ACCÈS SANS FIL TOUT EN LANÇANT UN APPEL D'URGENCE, SYSTÈME POUR TRAITEMENT AMÉLIORÉ DES APPELS D'URGENCE, RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE POUR UNE GESTION AMÉLIORÉE D'APPELS D'URGENCE, ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR, POINT D'ACCÈS SANS FIL, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET PRODUIT LOGICIEL | [2016/47] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 26.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007032219 (RUDOLF MARIAN [CA], et al); | [XI]US2008009262 (RUDOLF MARIAN [FR], et al); | [XI]US2010297979 (WATFA MAHMOUD [CA], et al) | Examination | US2011171926 |