|
14.01.2022 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.06.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
30.04.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
30.04.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2021 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2021 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.04.2021 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2021 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2021 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2021 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2021 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2021 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2021 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
13.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
11 |
|
10.11.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.11.2020 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.11.2020 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.11.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.08.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
03.08.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
03.08.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2016 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
15.02.2016 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Abstract |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
25 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |