EP2949818 - CONSTRUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 5-1, Koraku 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8563 / JP | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeuchi, Ken Tsuchiura Works, Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650, Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Shinichiro Tsuchiura Works, Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650, Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 03 /
Naya, Itaru Tsuchiura Works, Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650, Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 04 /
Yoshihara, Shigeyuki Tsuchiura Works, Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650, Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2015/49] | Application number, filing date | 15169389.2 | 27.05.2015 | [2015/49] | Priority number, date | JP20140112942 | 30.05.2014 Original published format: JP 2014112942 | [2015/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2949818 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2949818 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/08, B60K11/04, B60K1/04, B60K7/00, E02F9/12, E02F9/20, H01G9/00, H01G2/10 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
E02F9/0866 (EP,US);
B60K11/04 (EP,US);
B60K7/0015 (EP,US);
E02F9/123 (EP,US);
E02F9/166 (US);
E02F9/20 (US);
E02F9/2075 (EP,US);
E02F9/2091 (EP,US);
H01M50/204 (EP,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/412 (EP,US);
H01G2/10 (EP,US);
H01G9/0003 (EP,US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10S903/907 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/49] | E02F9/08, B60K1/04, E02F9/12, E02F9/20, H01G9/00, H01G2/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Title | German: | BAUMASCHINE | [2015/49] | English: | CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | [2015/49] | French: | MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION | [2015/49] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 08.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2015 | AL | 01.02.2017 | AT | 01.02.2017 | CY | 01.02.2017 | CZ | 01.02.2017 | DK | 01.02.2017 | EE | 01.02.2017 | ES | 01.02.2017 | FI | 01.02.2017 | HR | 01.02.2017 | IT | 01.02.2017 | LT | 01.02.2017 | LV | 01.02.2017 | MC | 01.02.2017 | MK | 01.02.2017 | NL | 01.02.2017 | PL | 01.02.2017 | RO | 01.02.2017 | RS | 01.02.2017 | SE | 01.02.2017 | SI | 01.02.2017 | SK | 01.02.2017 | SM | 01.02.2017 | TR | 01.02.2017 | BG | 01.05.2017 | NO | 01.05.2017 | GR | 02.05.2017 | IE | 27.05.2017 | LU | 27.05.2017 | MT | 27.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | IS | 01.06.2017 | PT | 01.06.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
TR | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IE | 27.05.2017 | ||
LU | 27.05.2017 | ||
MT | 27.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IE | 27.05.2017 | ||
LU | 27.05.2017 | ||
MT | 27.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IE | 27.05.2017 | ||
LU | 27.05.2017 | ||
MT | 27.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IE | 27.05.2017 | ||
LU | 27.05.2017 | ||
MT | 27.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IE | 27.05.2017 | ||
LU | 27.05.2017 | ||
MT | 27.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IE | 27.05.2017 | ||
LU | 27.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IE | 27.05.2017 | ||
LU | 27.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 27.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2002327461 (KOBELCO CONSTR MACHINERY LTD) [AD] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP2527540 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP2664715 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | JP2002327461 |