EP2933788 - ALERT GENERATION AND RELATED AIRCRAFT OPERATING METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 855 S. Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2022/19] |
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | ||
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitlow, Stephen P.O. Box 2245 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | 02 /
Rogers, William P.O. Box 2245 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | 03 /
Ververs, Patricia May P.O. Box 2245 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | 04 /
Mathan, Santosh P.O. Box 2245 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [2024/17] |
Former [2015/43] | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15169453.6 | 16.09.2011 | [2015/43] | Priority number, date | US20100890133 | 24.09.2010 Original published format: US 890133 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2933788 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2933788 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2933788 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/06, B64D25/00, A62B99/00, A61B5/18, B64D45/00 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
B64D45/0059 (EP,US);
G09B19/165 (US);
A61B5/18 (EP,US);
B64D45/0015 (EP,US);
B64D45/0056 (EP,US);
G08B21/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | WARNHINWEISERZEUGUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE FLUGZEUGBETRIEBSVERFAHREN | [2015/43] | English: | ALERT GENERATION AND RELATED AIRCRAFT OPERATING METHODS | [2015/43] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'ALERTES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE D'AVION CORRESPONDANTS | [2015/43] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 26.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11181726.8 / EP2434465 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6060989 (GEHLOT NARAYAN L [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 1, lines 66-34; figures 1-4 * * column 3, lines 13-15 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 55 * * column 6, lines 17-22 * [I] 2-6,11,12; | [A]US6097295 (GRIESINGER MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 10; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2818932 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-14* page 8, lines 20-23 *; | [XI]US2008291032 (PROKHOROV DANIL V [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9 * paragraphs [0010] , [ 277] - [0030] - [0034] , [0 39] - [0045] - [0 50] , [0 59] , [0 60] , [0 63] , [0 65] , [0 71]; figures 1, 2, 4, 5 * [I] 7,8,10-14 | Examination | US2010159433 |