EP3098738 - AEROSOL NEBULIZER CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARI Pharma GmbH Moosstrasse 3 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2016/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finke, Matthias Josef-von-Hirsch-Strasse 47 82152 Planegg / DE | 02 /
Achtzehner, Wolfgang Rossfeldstr. 41 82239 Alling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | 01 /
Finke, Matthias Appenzeller Straße 95 81475 München / DE | ||
02 /
Achtzehner, Wolfgang Rossfeldstr. 41 82239 Alling / DE | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/48] | Application number, filing date | 15169894.1 | 29.05.2015 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3098738 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
A24F40/53 (EP);
A24F40/65 (EP);
A61M15/009 (US);
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
G16H20/13 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AEROSOLZERSTÄUBERSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/48] | English: | AEROSOL NEBULIZER CONTROL DEVICE | [2016/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE NÉBULISEUR AÉROSOL | [2016/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2015 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 30.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 22.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]DE10243371 (PARI GMBH [DE]) [ID] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [I]US2008097908 (DICKS KENT [US], et al) [I] 1-21 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0032] , [0044] - [0047] - [0050] , [0052]; figures 1-2B *; | [A]US2010045425 (CHIVALLIER M LAURENT [FR]) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [I]DE102012104214 (XYLEM IP HOLDINGS LLC [US]) [I] 1-21 * paragraphs [0031] , [0034] , [0078] , [0082] , [84110] - [0114]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2015133052 (REUNAMAKI JUKKA PEKKA [FI], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0019] - [0024]; figures 1,2,7-9 * | by applicant | DE10243371 | US2006237001 |