EP2942201 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DECORATIVE PAPER AND DIGITAL PRINTING APPARATUS FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flooring Industries Limited, SARL 10b, Rue des Mérovingiens (ZI Bourmicht) 8070 Bertrange / LU | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/14] | For all designated states Parador GmbH Millenkamp 7 - 8 48653 Coesfeld / DE | ||
For all designated states Flooring Industries Limited, SARL 10b, Rue des Mérovingiens (ZI Bourmicht) 8070 Bertrange / LU | |||
Former [2015/46] | For all designated states Hülsta-Werke Hüls GmbH & CO. KG Karl-Hüls-Strasse 1 48703 Stadtlohn / DE | ||
For all designated states Flooring Industries Limited, SARL 10b, Rue des Mérovingiens (ZI Bourmicht) 8070 Bertrange / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TÜNTE, Udo Dückerstrasse 7 46348 Raesfeld / DE | 02 /
SCHWITTE, Richard Ebbingshof 65 48712 Gescher / DE | 03 /
PETERSEN, Frank Timphorst 29 48653 Coesfeld / DE | [2015/46] | Representative(s) | Unilin Technologies Patent Department Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/40] | Corradini, Lorenzo Marazzi Group S.r.l. Viale Regina Pacis, 39 41049 Sassuolo (MO) / IT | ||
Former [2015/46] | Schacht, Benny Marcel Corneel, et al Unilin Industries, BVBA Patent Department Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | Application number, filing date | 15169902.2 | 29.05.2009 | [2015/46] | Priority number, date | DE20081030955 | 02.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008030955 | [2015/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2942201 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2942201 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2942201 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B41M3/18, B41J11/00 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
B41J11/00216 (EP,US);
B41J11/0022 (EP,US);
B41M3/18 (EP);
B41M5/0011 (EP);
B41M7/009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2015/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DEKORPAPIER UND DIGITALDRUCKVORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2015/46] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DECORATIVE PAPER AND DIGITAL PRINTING APPARATUS FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | [2015/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER DÉCORATIF ET DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION NUMÉRIQUE POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCÉDÉ | [2015/46] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 19.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09772060.1 / EP2293947 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | ES | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | NL | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | AT | 29.05.2023 | GB | 29.05.2023 | IE | 29.05.2023 | LU | 29.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | FR | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
GB | 29.05.2023 | ||
IE | 29.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
FR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
IE | 29.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | CZ | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | CZ | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | CZ | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 05.10.2022 | |
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 05.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005151815 (KANAI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 8-10 * abstract * [I] 1-7,11-13; | [I]US2007176994 (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU], et al) [I] 1-4,6,7,11,13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] ** paragraph [0533] - paragraph [0535]; figures 5-7 * | Examination | DE69303537T | EP1749676 | by applicant | DE19916546 | EP1749676 |