EP2954784 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A SPREADABLE FRUIT PRESERVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krencker, Fabrice 14 rue du Climont 68420 Ranrupt / FR | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Hege, Frédéric Hege Conseils 1 Place Gutenberg 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2015/51] | Application number, filing date | 15170006.9 | 30.05.2015 | [2015/51] | Priority number, date | FR20140055373 | 13.06.2014 Original published format: FR 1455373 | [2015/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2954784 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A23L21/12, A23L19/00 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
A23L19/09 (EP);
A23L21/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/51] | A23L1/064 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2015/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER STREICHFÄHIGEN OBSTKONSERVE | [2015/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING A SPREADABLE FRUIT PRESERVE | [2015/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE CONSERVE DE FRUITS TARTINABLE | [2015/51] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010215827 (ROSS FREDERICK CLIFTON [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-9; | [I]GB470753 (ROBERT SCOTT) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [I]GB133456 (MONTI EUDO [IT]) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0301956 (SHONAN KORYO CORP [JP]) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0429966 (MEIDI YA FOOD FACTORY [JP]) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010002467 (ROSS FREDERICK CLIFTON [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AD]CN102090555 (TIELING CHUANGSHUN FOOD PROC CO LTD) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | CN102090555 | EP0301956 | EP0429966 |