EP2957871 - METHOD OF PREDICTION OF AN AIRCRAFT SHORT TERM FLIGHT PATH, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT, ASSOCIATED PREDICTION DEVICE, GUIDANCE METHOD, GUIDANCE SYSTEM AND AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LISSAJOUX, Sylvain C/o THALES AVIONICS 105 avenue du Général Eisenhower BP 63647 31000 TOULOUSE / FR | 02 /
BADATCHEFF, Alexandre 105 Rue Barbès 18000 BOURGES / FR | 03 /
CLAYBROUGH, Matthieu C/o THALES AVIONICS 105 avenue du Général Eisenhower BP 63647 31000 TOULOUSE / FR | [2016/16] |
Former [2015/52] | 01 /
LISSAJOUX, Sylvain C/o THALES AVIONICS 105 avenue du Général Eisenhower BP 63647 31000 TOULOUSE / FR | ||
02 /
BADATCHEFF, Alexandre C/o THALES AVIONICS 105 avenue du Général Eisenhower BP 63647 31000 TOULOUSE / FR | |||
03 /
CLAYBROUGH, Matthieu C/o THALES AVIONICS 105 avenue du Général Eisenhower BP 63647 31000 TOULOUSE / FR | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2017/18] |
Former [2015/52] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15170522.5 | 03.06.2015 | [2015/52] | Priority number, date | FR20140001357 | 16.06.2014 Original published format: FR 1401357 | [2015/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2957871 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2957871 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/10, G01C23/00, G08G5/00 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
G05D1/101 (EP,US);
G01C23/00 (EP,US);
G08G5/0047 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/52] | G01C23/00, G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2015/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VORHERSAGEN EINER KURZZEIT-FLUGBAHN EINES LUFTFAHRZEUGS, ENTSPRECHENDES COMPUTERPROGRAMM, ENTSPRECHENDE VORHERSAGEVORRICHTUNG, LENKVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDES LUFTFAHRZEUG | [2015/52] | English: | METHOD OF PREDICTION OF AN AIRCRAFT SHORT TERM FLIGHT PATH, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT, ASSOCIATED PREDICTION DEVICE, GUIDANCE METHOD, GUIDANCE SYSTEM AND AIRCRAFT | [2015/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION D'UNE TRAJECTOIRE COURT TERME D'UN AÉRONEF, PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR, DISPOSITIF DE PRÉDICTION, PROCÉDÉ DE GUIDAGE, SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE ET AÉRONEF ASSOCIÉS | [2015/52] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 16.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 23.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2015 | AL | 03.05.2017 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | MT | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | RS | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | IE | 03.06.2017 | LU | 03.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | DE | 03.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 03.06.2015 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 03.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 03.06.2015 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 03.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 03.06.2015 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 03.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 03.06.2015 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 03.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.06.2015 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 03.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 03.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 03.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 03.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 03.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/20] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5920321 (OWEN GARY L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 16 - line 56; figures 1a, 1b,2 *; | [A]US2008161982 (COULMEAU FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] - [0027]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2011196549 (SHARKANY FRANK C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0027]; figure 2 *; | [AD]US8086362 (DUPRE ALAIN [FR], et al) [AD] 1-15* column 4, line 17 - line 61; figure 1 * | by applicant | US8086362 |