EP3101412 - MOBILE APPARATUS FOR ANALYZING A SURFACE AREA OF AN OBJECT USING RAMAN SPECTROSCOPY AND FLUORESCENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states rascope AG Espenstrasse 135 9443 Widnau / CH | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Urs Schmitterstrasse 13 9444 Diepoldsau / CH | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Schulz Junghans Patentanwälte PartGmbB Großbeerenstraße 71 10963 Berlin / DE | [2016/49] | Application number, filing date | 15170743.7 | 04.06.2015 | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3101412 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N21/65, G01N21/94 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
G01N21/65 (EP);
G01J3/0218 (EP);
G01J3/0272 (EP);
G01J3/06 (EP);
G01J3/44 (EP);
G01N21/6408 (EP);
G01N21/6456 (EP);
G01N21/6486 (EP);
G01N2021/1734 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANALYSE EINES OBERFLÄCHENBEREICHS EINES OBJEKTS MITTELS RAMAN-SPEKTROSKOPIE UND FLUORESZENZ | [2016/49] | English: | MOBILE APPARATUS FOR ANALYZING A SURFACE AREA OF AN OBJECT USING RAMAN SPECTROSCOPY AND FLUORESCENCE | [2016/49] | French: | APPAREIL MOBILE SERVANT À ANALYSER UNE AIRE DE SURFACE D'UN OBJET À L'AIDE DE LA SPECTROSCOPIE RAMAN ET DE FLUORESCENCE | [2016/49] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 21.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2014139821 (MATHIEU PIERRE [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,7,9,10,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 28] , [0 32] , [0 41] - [0043] * [A] 13; | [X]EP1983332 (HORIBA JOBIN YVON SAS [FR]) [X] 1,4,6 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 23] , [0 35] , [0 38] - [0041] - [0 44] - [0045] *; | [X]US2003179372 (KNEBEL WERNER [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2007222981 (PONSARDIN PATRICK L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs 33-34, 54, 55 - pages 1, 4B, 8 *; | [A]US2002036824 (SASAKI HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP2053384 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US2012038908 | US2012078524 | US2007153268 |