EP2955511 - IN-SITU SYSTEM AND METHOD OF DETERMINING COATING INTEGRITY OF TURBOMACHINERY COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UTAY, Arthur W. 482 Main St. South Windsor, CT 06074 / US | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15171117.3 | 09.06.2015 | [2015/51] | Priority number, date | US201462009389P | 09.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462009389 P | [2015/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2955511 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/72, F01D21/00 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
F01D21/003 (EP,US);
G01M15/14 (US);
F01D17/02 (EP,US);
G01N21/35 (US);
G01N25/72 (EP,US);
F05D2260/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] |
Former [2015/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN-SITU-SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER BESCHICHTUNGSINTEGRITÄT VON TURBOMASCHINENKOMPONENTEN | [2015/51] | English: | IN-SITU SYSTEM AND METHOD OF DETERMINING COATING INTEGRITY OF TURBOMACHINERY COMPONENTS | [2015/51] | French: | SYSTÈME IN SITU ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'INTÉGRITÉ D'UN REVÊTEMENT DE COMPOSANTS DE TURBOMACHINES | [2015/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 23.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002257764 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [I]GB2397878 (CHANDLER PETER EDMOND [GB], et al) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2005199832 (TWERDOCHLIB MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0012] - [0020] , [0021]; figure 1 * [I] 3-5,8,11,12; | [A]EP1614864 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [I] - MAFFREN T ET AL, "Influence of the surface roughness on images acquired by flying spot active thermography: Case of the high pressure turbine blades", 2013 IEEE INTERNATIONAL INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE (I2MTC), IEEE, (20120513), doi:10.1109/I2MTC.2012.6229274, ISSN 1091-5281, ISBN 978-1-4577-1773-4, pages 454 - 457, XP032451375 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/I2MTC.2012.6229274 |