EP2963638 - DISPLAY DRIVING APPARATUS AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLUM CO., LTD. B3-4F, 150 Maeyeong-ro (Maetan-dong) Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16674 / KR | [2017/13] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. (Maetan-dong) 150, Maeyeong-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Deuk Hee c/o Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co. Ltd.,(Maetan-dong) 150 Maeyeong-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Ryu, Jong Gi (Amsa-dong) 101-701, 28 Godeok-ro 27-gil Gangdong-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Lee, Jong Woo (Jeonnong-dong) 303ho, 3 Seoulsiripdae-ro 28-gil Dongdaemun-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Lee, Jae Shin (Ggummaeul Dongah Apt. Pyeongchon-dong) 309-1301, 294 Gwiin-ro, Dongan-gu, Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Cho, Koon Shik (Samsung Apt., Daechi-dong) 112-207, 22, Dogok-ro 78-gil, Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 06 /
Lee, Tae Ha (Hansol Maeul Jugong 4danji Apt., Jeongja-dong) 403-708 206, Baekhyeon-ro, Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 15171759.2 | 12.06.2015 | [2016/01] | Priority number, date | KR20140083484 | 04.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140083484 | KR20150010116 | 21.01.2015 Original published format: KR 20150010116 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2963638 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/34 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
G09G3/344 (EP,US);
G06F1/3265 (US);
G09G3/3453 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G2380/04 (EP,US);
G09G3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2016/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEANSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2016/01] | English: | DISPLAY DRIVING APPARATUS AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2016/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF EXCITATEUR POUR UN AFFICHAGE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE L'INCLUANT | [2016/01] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 05.07.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003210240 (LACAYO ORLANDO J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * [Y] 3-14; | [Y]WO2004066254 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 3-14 * abstract ** page 6, line 16 - line 26 * |