EP2957780 - LOCKING HINGE FOR CONVERTIBLE STAND/TABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helping Hands International Holdings Limited 3rd floor J&C Building Road Town P.O.Box 933 Tortola / VG | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wong, Chi Shing 147 Wong Yue Tan Tai Po / CN | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Soler Lerma, Santiago Vitoria de Lerma Asociados International Department C/Poeta Querol nº 1 pta 10 46002 Valencia / ES | [2015/52] | Application number, filing date | 15172001.8 | 13.06.2015 | [2015/52] | Priority number, date | US201414308621 | 18.06.2014 Original published format: US201414308621 | US201414308609 | 18.06.2014 Original published format: US201414308609 | US201414308623 | 18.06.2014 Original published format: US201414308623 | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2957780 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/10, F16C11/00 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
F16C11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2015/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPERRSCHARNIER FÜR UMWANDELBAREN STAND/TISCH | [2015/52] | English: | LOCKING HINGE FOR CONVERTIBLE STAND/TABLE | [2015/52] | French: | BLOCAGE DE CHARNIÈRE POUR TABLE/SUPPORT CONVERTIBLE | [2015/52] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 30.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2017 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 01.03.2017 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 05.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5520474 (LIU YANG-TING [TW]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2007077971 (TU YING-LIANG [CN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] *; | [A]US2012175474 (BARNARD BRANDON [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] *; | [A]US2002131814 (HOU JEN-EN [TW], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |