EP2952393 - AIRBAG DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM FOR A FABRIC WRAPPED VEHICLE INTERIOR PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 5757 North Green Bay Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US | [2017/34] |
Former [2015/50] | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 915 East 32nd Street Holland, MI 49423 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cowelchuk, Glenn A. 317 Winterpine Way Holland, MI 49424 / US | 02 /
Smith, Nels 10230 Springwood Dr. Zeeland, MI 49464 / US | 03 /
Springer, Heather R. 9501 Lakeshore Dr. West Olive, MI 49460 / US | 04 /
Judek, Mark S. 4450 Savoie Trail West Bloomfield, MI 48323 / US | 05 /
Bozio, Ronald A. 14745 Powderhorn Trail Holland, MI 49424 / US | 06 /
Smith, Sandra L. 2340 Marwood Waterford, MI 48328 / US | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Finger, Catrin Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 10-11 99096 Erfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 15172202.2 | 06.01.2012 | [2015/50] | Priority number, date | US201161430746P | 07.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161430746 P | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2952393 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2952393 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/215 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
B60R21/215 (EP,KR,US);
B60R21/205 (EP,KR,US);
B60R21/2165 (US);
B62D25/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2015/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AIRBAGAUSLÖSUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE MIT EINEM STOFF UMHÜLLTE FAHRZEUGINNENVERKLEIDUNG | [2015/50] | English: | AIRBAG DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM FOR A FABRIC WRAPPED VEHICLE INTERIOR PANEL | [2015/50] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉPLOIEMENT D'AIRBAG POUR UN PANNEAU INTÉRIEUR DE VÉHICULE ENROULÉ DANS UN TISSU | [2015/50] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 22.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/32] | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/32] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12701391.0 / EP2661384 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE102005005886 (FAURECIA SIEGES D AUTOMOBILE N [FR]) [X] 1-5,8,10,11,13,14 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 2-5 * [Y] 1,8,13; | [XY]US2006113767 (TRACHT MICHAEL L [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0033] * * figure 2 * [Y] 1; | [Y]WO0181126 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1,8,13 * page 6, line 4 - line 9 * * page 7, line 4 - line 21 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP2233372 (INT AUTOMOTIVE COMPONENTS [DE]) [A] 1,8,13 * paragraph [0005] * |