EP2947082 - N1-PYRAZOLOSPIROKETONE ACETYL-CoA CARBOXYLASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2015/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bagley, Scott William Pfizer Global Research & Development Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 02 /
Griffith, David Andrew Pfizer Global Research & Development Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 03 /
Kung, Daniel Wei-Shung Pfizer Global Research & Development Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2015/48] | Application number, filing date | 15172294.9 | 29.10.2010 | [2015/48] | Priority number, date | US20090259823P | 10.11.2009 Original published format: US 259823 P | [2015/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2947082 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/10, A61K31/438, // A61P3/10, A61P1/16 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
C07D471/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/438 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2015/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 25.05.2016 | ME | 25.05.2016 | Title | German: | N1-PYRAZOLOSPIROKETON-ACETYL-CoA-CARBOXYLASEHEMMER | [2015/48] | English: | N1-PYRAZOLOSPIROKETONE ACETYL-CoA CARBOXYLASE INHIBITORS | [2015/48] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE N1-PYRAZOLOSPIROCÉTONE ACÉTYL-CoA CARBOXYLASE | [2015/48] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 26.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10776438.3 / EP2499139 | EP13183518.3 / EP2676958 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007011809 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-22 *; | [A]EP1911753 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [A] 1-13* claims 1-20 *; | [A]WO2008065508 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-18 *; | [A]WO2008088689 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-14 *; | [A]WO2008125945 (PFIZER [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-15 *; | [AP]EP2123652 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [AP] 1-13 * claims 1-16 *; | [AP]WO2009144554 (PFIZER [US], et al) [AP] 1-13 * claims 1-20 *; | [AP]WO2009144555 (PFIZER [US], et al) [AP] 1-13 * claims 1-19 * | by applicant | US2002009494 | US6818658 | US2005267100 | WO2005116034 | US2006178501 | EP0901786 | - ABU-ETHEIGA, L. ET AL., "Acetyl-CoA carboxylase 2 mutant mice are protected against obesity and diabetes induced by high-fat/high-carbohydrate diets", PNAS, (2003), vol. 100, no. 18, pages 10207 - 10212 | - CHOI, C.S. ET AL., "Continuous fat oxidation in acetyl-CoA carboxylase 2 knockout mice increases total energy expenditure, reduces fat mass, and improves insulin sensitivity", PNAS, (2007), vol. 104, no. 42, pages 16480 - 16485 | - SAVAGE, D.B. ET AL., "Reversal of diet-induced hepatic steatosis and hepatic insulin resistance by antisense oligonucleotide inhibitors of acetyl-CoA carboxylases 1 and 2", J CLIN INVEST | - OH, W. ET AL., "Glucose and fat metabolism in adipose tissue of acetyl-CoA-carboxylase 2 knockout mice", PNAS, (2005), vol. 102, no. 5, pages 1384 - 1389 | - LOUIS F. FIESER; MARY FIESER, Reaoents for Organic Synthesis, WILEY, (1967), vol. 1-19 | - Beilsteins Handbuch der organischen Chemie, SPRINGER-VERLAG | - ROY, S. ET AL., CHEM. EUR. J., (2006), vol. 12, pages 3777 - 3788 | - MURALI DHAR, T.G. ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2007), vol. 17, pages 5019 - 5024 | - WOLINSKY, J. ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1978), vol. 43, no. 5, pages 875 - 881 | - NISHIMURA, T. ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2008), vol. 10, no. 18, pages 4057 - 4060 | - BERGE ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - TAKEUCHI, H. ET AL., "Enhancement of the dissolution rate of a poorly water-soluble drug (tolbutamide) by a spray-drying solvent deposition method and disintegrants", J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1987), vol. 39, pages 769 - 773 | - ZIMMET, P.Z. ET AL., "The Metabolic Syndrome: Perhaps an Etiologic Mystery but Far From a Myth - Where Does the International Diabetes Federation Stand?", DIABETES & ENDOCRINOLO, (2005), vol. 7, no. 2 | - ALBERTI, K.G. ET AL., "The Metabolic Syndrome - A New Worldwide Definition", LANCET, (2005), vol. 366, pages 1059 - 62 | - ZHANG, S. ET AL., DRUG DISCOVERY TODAV, (2007), vol. 12, no. 9/10, pages 373 - 381 | - STILL, J. ORG. CHEM., (1978), vol. 43, page 2923 | - P.KOROVCHENKO ET AL., CATALYSIS TODAY, (2007), vol. 121, pages 13 - 21 | - TET. LET., (1971), vol. 19, page 1591 | - GULLAND, J.M.; ROBINSON, R. J., CHEM. SOC., TRANS., (1925), vol. 127, pages 1493 - 503 | - BOGERT, M. T.; FISHER, HARRY L., ORIG. COM. 8TH INTERN. CANGR. APPL. CHEM., (1912), vol. 6, pages 37 - 44 | - DYKE, S. F.; WHITE, A. W. C.; HARTLEY, D., TETRAHEDRON, (1973), vol. 29, pages 857 - 62 | - J. HET. CHEM., (1999), vol. 36, page 217 | - FILLION, E., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2004), vol. 46, pages 1091 - 1094 | - L. GAO ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR. B, (2007), vol. 853, pages 303 - 313 |