EP2937070 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING AN AIR MATTRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006-9167 / US | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bhai, Aziz A. 8590 Laurel Ct. Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15172791.4 | 25.07.2006 | [2015/44] | Priority number, date | US20050702645P | 26.07.2005 Original published format: US 702645 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2937070 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2937070 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/057, A61B5/00, A61B5/11 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
A61G7/05769 (EP,US);
A61B5/1115 (EP,US);
A61B5/6892 (EP,US);
A61G7/0527 (EP,US);
A61G2203/34 (EP,US);
A61G2203/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/22] |
Former [2015/44] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER MIT LUFT GEFÜLLTEN MATRATZE | [2015/44] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING AN AIR MATTRESS | [2015/44] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER UN MATELAS PNEUMATIQUE | [2015/44] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 07.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06813228.1 / EP1912537 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB1595417 (WELCH H G) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 108 - page 5, line 3; figures 1, 2, 7, 8, 10, 11 * [I] 7; | [XI]EP0853918 (PEGASUS AIRWAVE LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 14 - column 8, line 3; figures 1-8 * [I] 7; | [A]US5815864 (SLOOP DAVID J [US]) [A] 1-11* the whole document * | by applicant | US6691346 | US20050702645 |