EP3106876 - SOLID WASTE REMOVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhoferstrasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peter, André Obermattpark 5 6045 Meggen / CH | 02 /
Troxler, Markus Holzhaeusernstr.38 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Herren, Barbara Roche Diagnostics International AG Forrenstrasse 2 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [2016/51] | Application number, filing date | 15172874.8 | 19.06.2015 | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3106876 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3106876 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, // G01N35/04, G01N35/10 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
G01N35/00 (EP,CN,US);
G01N35/00722 (US);
B65G47/90 (CN);
G01N35/00663 (US);
G01N35/0099 (CN);
G01N2035/00188 (CN);
G01N2035/00277 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00891 (US);
G01N35/04 (EP,US);
G01N35/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] |
Former [2016/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FESTSTOFFABFALLENTSORGUNG | [2016/51] | English: | SOLID WASTE REMOVAL | [2016/51] | French: | ÉLIMINATION DE DÉCHETS SOLIDES | [2016/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.12.2022 | AT | 07.12.2022 | CZ | 07.12.2022 | DK | 07.12.2022 | EE | 07.12.2022 | ES | 07.12.2022 | FI | 07.12.2022 | HR | 07.12.2022 | IT | 07.12.2022 | LT | 07.12.2022 | LV | 07.12.2022 | MC | 07.12.2022 | NL | 07.12.2022 | PL | 07.12.2022 | RO | 07.12.2022 | RS | 07.12.2022 | SE | 07.12.2022 | SI | 07.12.2022 | SK | 07.12.2022 | SM | 07.12.2022 | NO | 07.03.2023 | GR | 08.03.2023 | IS | 07.04.2023 | PT | 10.04.2023 | IE | 19.06.2023 | LU | 19.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
IE | 19.06.2023 | ||
LU | 19.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
IE | 19.06.2023 | ||
LU | 19.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
LU | 19.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 07.12.2022 | |
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 07.12.2022 | |
NO | 07.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3802782 (NATELSON S) [A] 1,6* figure 1b *; | [XAY]CA1313113 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [X] 1,6,8,9 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraphs 1-4 * * figures 1,4 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * [A] 2-4,10 [Y] 7; | [YA]US2008175756 (JUSTIN MICHAEL JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 7 * page 9, paragraphs 128-130 * [A] 5 | Examination | US2013157372 | CN104297502 | by applicant | US2013065797 |