EP2960756 - TOUCH-TYPE INPUT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho 260 Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | For all designated states SMK Corporation 5-5, Togoshi 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142 / JP | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMAI, Takao c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Rika Denki 260, Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIKAWA, Osamu c/o SMK Corporation 5-5, Togoshi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 142-8511 / JP | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 15173279.9 | 23.06.2015 | [2016/01] | Priority number, date | JP20140131711 | 26.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014131711 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2960756 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
G06F3/04182 (EP,US);
G06F3/0445 (EP,US);
G06F3/0446 (EP,US);
G09G3/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2016/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINGABEVORRICHTUNG MIT BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM | [2016/01] | English: | TOUCH-TYPE INPUT DEVICE | [2016/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTREE DE TYPE TACTILE | [2016/01] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/47] | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013176268 (LI TIANHAO [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0028]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0121]; figure 8 * * paragraphs [0123] , [0125] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0155]; figures 10,11 * * paragraph [0165]; figure 14 * * paragraph [0175] *; | [A]EP2631744 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0005] - [0006] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | JP2010009321 |