EP3085370 - CALEBIN A FOR INDUCING LIPOLYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/43] | CALEBIN A FOR HEPATIC STEATOSIS | ||
[2018/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Majeed, Muhammed 117, Coppertree Court Edison, NJ 08820 / US | For all designated states Majeed, Anju 31 Matthew Court Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | For all designated states Nagabhushanam, Kalyanam 39 Brooklawn Drive East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Wetterkreuz 3 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Marie-Curie-Str. 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 15173299.7 | 23.06.2015 | [2016/43] | Priority number, date | US201514690438 | 19.04.2015 Original published format: US201514690438 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3085370 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3085370 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/216, A61P1/16, A61P3/04 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/216 (EP);
A61K31/215 (RU);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2121/00 (RU)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] |
Former [2016/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | CALEBIN A UM LYPOLYSE ZU INDUZIEREN | [2018/31] | English: | CALEBIN A FOR INDUCING LIPOLYSIS | [2018/31] | French: | CALEBIN-A POUR INDUIRE LA LYPOLYSE | [2018/31] |
Former [2016/43] | CALEBIN A ZUR LEBERSTEATOSE | ||
Former [2016/43] | CALEBIN A FOR HEPATIC STEATOSIS | ||
Former [2016/43] | CALEBIN-A POUR LA STÉATOSE HÉPATIQUE | Examination procedure | 23.06.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 18.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2015 | AL | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | IT | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | MT | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | LU | 23.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 23.06.2015 | |
AL | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 23.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.06.2015 | |
AL | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 23.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 23.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 23.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/27] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013109241 (MAJEED MUHAMMED [US], et al) [X] 2 * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] , [0019]; claims 1,4,8 *; | [XY]US2014249219 (MAJEED MUHAMMED [US], et al) [X] 2 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] * * example IV * * paragraph [0110]; tables VI,X * * claims 1-5,8,9 * [Y] 1; | [E]EP2937084 (MAJEED MUHAMMED [US], et al) [E] 1 * paragraph [0025]; claims 9-11; table IV *; | [Y] - RAMIN KAFFASHI ELAHI, "Preventive effects of Turmeric (Curcuma longa Linn.) Powder on hepatic steatosis in the rats fed with high fat diet", LIFE SCIENCE JOURNAL, (20120101), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 5462 - 5468, XP055295414 [Y] 1 * the whole document * | [T] - CHING-SHU LAI ET AL, "Calebin-A inhibits adipogenesis and hepatic steatosis in high-fat diet-induced obesity via activation of AMPK signaling", MOLECULAR NUTRITION & FOOD RESEARCH, DE, (20150720), vol. 59, no. 10, doi:10.1002/mnfr.201400809, ISSN 1613-4125, pages 1883 - 1895, XP055295127 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mnfr.201400809 | Examination | - BAYS HAROLD E ET AL, "Pathogenic potential of adipose tissue and metabolic consequences of adipocyte hypertrophy and increased visceral adiposity.", EXPERT REVIEW OF CARDIOVASCULAR THERAPY MAR 2008, (200803), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1744-8344, pages 343 - 368 | - GUSTAFSON BIRGIT ET AL, "Insulin resistance and impaired adipogenesis.", TRENDS IN ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM: TEM APR 2015, (201504), vol. 26, no. 4, ISSN 1879-3061, pages 193 - 200 | by applicant | - PARK S Y ET AL., J NAT PROD., (200209), vol. 65, no. 9, pages 1227 - 31 | - LI Y ET AL., EUR J. PHARMACOL., (20080904), vol. 591, no. 1-3, pages 252 - 8 | - ZENG Y ET AL., CHEM PHARM BULL (TOKYO, (200706), vol. 55, no. 6, pages 940 - 3 | - WU Z; XIE Y; MORRISON R F; BUCHER NLR; FARMER SR, "PPAR y induces the Insulin-dependent Glucose Transporter GLUT4 in the absence of C/EBPo during the conversion of 3T3 fibroblasts into adipocytes", J CLIN INVEST., (1998), vol. 101, pages 22 - 32 | - L A SALAZAR-OLIVO; F CASTRO-MUNOZLEDO; W KURI-HARCUCH, "A pre-adipose 3T3 cell variant highly sensitive to adipogenic factors & to human growth hormone", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 108, no. 5, pages 2101 - 2107 | - MINGUI FU; TINGWAN SUN; ANGIE L. BOOKOUT; MICHEAL DOWNES; RUTH T. YU; RONALD M. EVANS; DAVID J. MANGELSDORF., "A Nuclear Receptor Atlas: 3T3-L1 Adipogenesis", MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2005), vol. 19, no. 10, pages 2437 - 2450 | - AIMEE D KOHN ET AL., "Expression of a Constitutively Active Akt Ser/Thr Kinase in 3T3-L1 Adipocytes Stimulates Glucose Uptake and Glucose Transporter 4 Translocation", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.271.49.31372, pages 31372 - 31378, XP002558471 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.49.31372 | - TAMAR. R., "Aprahamian and Flora Sam, ''Adiponectin in Cardiovascular Inflammation and Obesity", INT J. INFLAM., (2011), page 376909 | - HOTTA K; FUNAHASHI T; ARITA Y ET AL., "Plasma concentrations of a novel, adipose-specific protein, adiponectin, in type 2 diabetic patients. Arteriosclerosis", THROMBOSIS AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 1595 - 1599, XP002952714 | - IWASHIMA Y; KATSUYA T; ISHIKAWA K ET AL., "Hypoadiponectinemia is an independent risk factor for hypertension", HYPERTENSION, (2004), vol. 43, no. 6, pages 1318 - 1323 | - KUMADA M; KIHARA S; SUMITSUJI S ET AL., "Association of hypoadiponectinemia with coronary artery disease in men. Arteriosclerosis", THROMBOSIS AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 85 - 89 | - LINDSAY R S; FUNAHASHI T; HANSON R L ET AL., "Adiponectin and development of type 2 diabetes in the Pima Indian population", THE LANCET, (2002), vol. 360, no. 9326, doi:doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(02)09335-2, pages 57 - 58, XP004790509 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(02)09335-2 | - BASTARD JP ET AL., "Recent Advances in the relationship between obesity, inflammation and insulin resistance", EUR CYTOKINE NETW., (200603), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 4 - 12 | - CLARA, B.; R. C. ARANCHA; G. M. ANDRE'S; P. ATANASIO; A. JULIA; O. ALBERTO, "A new method for detecting TNF-a-secreting cells using direct immunofluorescence surface membrane stainings", J. IMMUNO. METHODS, (2003), vol. 264, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(02)00083-2, pages 77 - 87, XP004362071 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(02)00083-2 | - KHURSHID A. BHAT; BHAHWAL A. SHAH; KULDEEP K. GUPTA; ANJALI PANDEY; SARANG BANI; SUBHASH C., "Taneja. Semi-synthetic analogs of pinitol as potential inhibitors of TNF-a cytokine expression in human neutrophils", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2009), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2009.02.050, pages 1939 - 1943, XP025974894 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2009.02.050 | - BRIEVA A; GUER-RERO A; ALONSO-LEBRERO J L; PIVEL J P., "Immunoferon, a glycoconjugate of natural origin, inhibits LPS-induced TNF-a production and inflammatory responses", INTERNATIONAL LMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, (2001), vol. 1, pages 1979 - 1987 | - BEHNKE, A. R., "Lean body mass", A.M.A. ARCH. INT. MED., (1953), vol. 91, page 585 | - H.F.KRAYBILL ET AL., J ANIM SCI, (1954), vol. 13, pages 548 - 555 | - CHAMUKUTTAN SNEHALATHA ET AL., "Plasma Adiponectin Is an Independent Predictor of Type 2 Diabetes in Asian Indians", DIABETES CARE, (200312), vol. 26, no. 12, doi:doi:10.2337/diacare.26.12.3226, pages 3226 - 3229, XP055423536 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diacare.26.12.3226 | - KLEINER, D.E.; BRUNT, E.M.; VAN, N.M.; BEHLING, C. ET AL., "Design and validation of a histological scoring system for nonalcoholic fatty liver disease", HEPATOLOGY, (2005), vol. 41, doi:doi:10.1002/hep.20701, pages 1313 - 1321, XP055123202 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.20701 |