EP2978236 - ELECTRONIC SHELF LABEL TAG, ELECTRONIC SHELF LABEL SYSTEM AND OPERATING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. 150, Maeyeong-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2016/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Young Suk c/o Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. Maeyoung-Ro 150 (Maetan-Dong) Youngtong-Gu, Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
LEE, Hae Won c/o Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. Maeyoung-Ro 150 (Maetan-Dong) Youngtong-Gu, Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/04] | Application number, filing date | 15173300.3 | 23.06.2015 | [2016/04] | Priority number, date | KR20140093040 | 23.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140093040 | [2016/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2978236 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00, G09F3/20 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
H04Q9/00 (EP,US);
G08B21/182 (US);
H04Q2209/10 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/43 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/88 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/883 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE REGALETIKETT-TAGS, SYSTEM FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE REGALETIKETTEN UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/04] | English: | ELECTRONIC SHELF LABEL TAG, ELECTRONIC SHELF LABEL SYSTEM AND OPERATING METHOD THEREOF | [2016/04] | French: | ÉTIQUETTE ELECTRONIQUE POUR L'ETIQUETAGE D'UNE ETAGERE, SYSTEME D'ETIQUETAGE ELECTRONIQUE D'ETAGERE ET SON PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2016/04] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 20.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0792001 (UNIDEN KK [JP]) [A] 1,5,10 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 4 * * column 10, lines 3-14 *; | [XA]EP1152366 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) [X] 5 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0084] * * claims 1, 7 * [A] 1,10; | [A]US2010253289 (AMIR HAIM [IL], et al) [A] 1,5,10 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0032] ** claims 1-2 *; | [XDA]EP2472462 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [XD] 5 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029] * [A] 1-4,6-15 | by applicant | KR20120077949 |