EP3109844 - OBJECT DETECTING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation Intellectual Property VAK - HB1 40 531 Göteborg / SE | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin-Sörstedt, Joakim Lerlyckegatan 8 417 28 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
Brännström, Mattias Miraallén 59 41758 Göteborg / SE | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2023/47] |
Former [2016/52] | Volvo Car Corporation 405 31 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 15173382.1 | 23.06.2015 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3109844 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3109844 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, B60Q1/14, B60Q1/24, G08G1/16, G06T7/73 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
G08G1/165 (EP,US);
G01C21/30 (CN);
B60Q1/0035 (EP,US);
B60Q1/1423 (EP,US);
B60Q1/247 (EP,US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06T7/60 (US);
G06T7/73 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (US);
G06V30/422 (US);
G08G1/166 (EP,US);
G08G1/167 (EP,US);
G08G1/168 (EP,US);
H04N23/56 (US);
B60Q2400/40 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30252 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | G08G1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] |
Former [2016/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OBJEKTDETEKTIONSANORDNUNG | [2016/52] | English: | OBJECT DETECTING ARRANGEMENT | [2016/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET | [2016/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 12.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.06.2023 | 20.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2005216255 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [Y] 3,9,13,15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraphs [0034] , [0037] *; | [XYI]JP2006290273 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,2,4,7,10-12,14 * paragraphs [0007] , [0012] - paragraphs [0015] , [0031]; figures 2,4 * [Y] 3,6,8,9,13,15 [I] 5; | [I]US2012002050 (TANIGUCHI SUSUMU [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,4,10-12,14 * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0132]; figure - *; | [Y]US2014218521 (TANAKA TAKESHI [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0019]; figure 1 *; | [XDY]US2014257640 (MITSUMOTO HISANORI [JP], et al) [XD] 1,11 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] *[Y] 8; | [X]KR101496322B (PARK YONG SUK [KR]) [X] 1,11 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * | Examination | US2010103040 | US2011090071 | US2013162824 | US2013257649 | by applicant | US2014257640 |