EP3037152 - CARBON DIOXIDE CAPTURING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Plant Systems & Services Corporation 36-5, Tsurumichuo 4-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Energy Systems & Solutions Corporation 72-34, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2018/26] |
Former [2016/26] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Plant Systems & Services Corporation 36-5, Tsurumichuo 4-Chome Tsurumi-Ku, Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa 2300051 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Udatsu, Mitsuru c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kashimoto, Satoru c/o Toshiba Plant Systems & Services Corporation 36-5, Tsurumichuo 4-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Hodotsuka, Masatoshi c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kitamura, Hideo c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Oohashi, Yukio c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Saito, Satoshi c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 15173631.1 | 24.06.2015 | [2016/26] | Priority number, date | JP20140246716 | 05.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014246716 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3037152 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3037152 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3037152 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
B01D53/1412 (EP,US);
B01D53/18 (CN,US);
B01D53/1425 (US);
B01D53/1475 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2258/0283 (EP,US);
B01D2259/65 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | KOHLENDIOXIDABSCHEIDUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON | [2016/26] | English: | CARBON DIOXIDE CAPTURING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME | [2016/26] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CAPTURE DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2016/26] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2015 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 26.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2015 | AL | 11.09.2019 | AT | 11.09.2019 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | DK | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | ES | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | IT | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | NL | 11.09.2019 | PL | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | RS | 11.09.2019 | SE | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | TR | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | PT | 13.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.06.2015 | |
AL | 11.09.2019 | ||
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | JP2013151876 [ ]; | [XI]US4152217 (EISENBERG BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 39 - line 66 * [I] 3-11; | [XI]EP2269712 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013]; claims 1,2,3,4 * * figure 1 * [I] 2-11; | [A]JP2013151876 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-12 * figure - *; | [A]WO2014077919 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] 6 * figures 1,8 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0037] , [0048] , [0053]; claim 1 *; | [A] - Amine Best Practices Group, "05/23/07 Amine Best Practices Group A Amine B Basic P Practices G Guidelines", (20070523), URL: http://refiningonline.com/abpg_kb/ABPG-5.pdf, (20160919), XP055303821 [A] 3,4 * pages 3,23,25, * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 55, Database accession no. 2013-M16465, & JP2013151876 A 20130808 (TOSHIBA KK) [ ] * abstract * |