EP2954870 - DISPOSABLE ORTHOPAEDIC SURGERY KIT AND COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOMET C.V. 57/63 Line Wall Road Gibraltar / GI | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIXTO, Robert 8235 SW 99th Street Miami, Florida 33156 / US | 02 /
KORTENBACH, Juergen, A 122 Pincecrest Drive Miami Springs, Florida 33166 / US | 03 /
FRANCESE, Jose, L 1161 Plover Avenue Miami Springs, Florida 33166 / US | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London, EC1A 4HD / GB | [2015/51] | Application number, filing date | 15174047.9 | 17.09.2010 | [2015/51] | Priority number, date | US20090243752P | 18.09.2009 Original published format: US 243752 P | [2015/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2954870 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2954870 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2954870 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/80, A61B17/86 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
A61B17/8061 (EP,US);
A61B17/17 (US);
A61B17/8014 (EP,US);
A61B17/84 (US);
A61B17/8615 (EP,US);
A61B17/865 (EP,US);
A61B17/8875 (US);
A61B17/888 (EP,US);
A61B17/90 (EP,US);
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
A61B50/36 (EP,US);
A61B17/1728 (EP,US);
A61B17/1739 (EP,US);
A61B17/1782 (EP,US);
A61B17/8052 (EP,US);
A61B17/8057 (EP,US);
A61B17/8605 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0051 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0056 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0065 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0066 (EP,US);
A61B2050/008 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3008 (EP,US);
A61B2090/062 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/12] | A61B50/30, A61B17/80, A61B17/86 | ||
Former IPC [2015/51] | A61B19/02, A61B17/80, A61B17/86 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2015/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINWEGSET FÜR ORTHOPÄDISCHE CHIRURGIE UND BESTANDTEILE | [2015/51] | English: | DISPOSABLE ORTHOPAEDIC SURGERY KIT AND COMPONENTS | [2015/51] | French: | KIT DE CHIRURGIE ORTHOPEDIQUE JETABLE ET COMPOSANTS | [2015/51] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 22.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10766149.8 / EP2477573 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2010 | AL | 25.04.2018 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | ES | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | NL | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | NO | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | LU | 17.09.2018 | MT | 17.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.09.2010 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MK | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
MT | 17.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 17.09.2010 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
MT | 17.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
MT | 17.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
MT | 17.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 25.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005261688 (GRADY MARK P JR [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 2A, 2B *; | [X]WO2007014192 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,11,12 * page 13 - page 14; figure 12 *; | [X]WO2007103376 (ORTHOHELIX SURGICAL DESIGNS [US], et al) [X] 1* page 15; figure 25 *; | [X]WO2009023666 (SYNTHES USA [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0054] , [0 66] * | by applicant | EP20100766149 |