EP2975269 - CENTRIFUGAL COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAO, Hidefumi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho,Toyota-shi Aichi-Ken 471-8571 / JP | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/03] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15175931.3 | 08.07.2015 | [2016/03] | Priority number, date | JP20140146093 | 16.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014146093 | JP20150078575 | 07.04.2015 Original published format: JP 2015078575 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2975269 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2975269 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04D27/02, F04D29/42, F04D29/68 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
F02B33/40 (EP,US);
F04D17/10 (US);
F04D25/02 (US);
F04D27/0207 (US);
F04D29/284 (US);
F04D29/4206 (US);
F04D29/4213 (EP,US);
F04D29/444 (EP,US);
F04D29/685 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGALVERDICHTER | [2016/03] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL COMPRESSOR | [2016/03] | French: | COMPRESSEUR CENTRIFUGE | [2016/03] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 15.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2015 | AL | 06.01.2021 | AT | 06.01.2021 | CY | 06.01.2021 | CZ | 06.01.2021 | DK | 06.01.2021 | EE | 06.01.2021 | ES | 06.01.2021 | FI | 06.01.2021 | HR | 06.01.2021 | IT | 06.01.2021 | LT | 06.01.2021 | LV | 06.01.2021 | MC | 06.01.2021 | MK | 06.01.2021 | MT | 06.01.2021 | NL | 06.01.2021 | PL | 06.01.2021 | RO | 06.01.2021 | RS | 06.01.2021 | SE | 06.01.2021 | SI | 06.01.2021 | SK | 06.01.2021 | SM | 06.01.2021 | TR | 06.01.2021 | BG | 06.04.2021 | NO | 06.04.2021 | GR | 07.04.2021 | IS | 06.05.2021 | PT | 06.05.2021 | IE | 08.07.2021 | LU | 08.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 08.07.2015 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
MK | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
TR | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 08.07.2015 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
MK | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 08.07.2015 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 08.07.2015 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE19823274 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [I] 1,5,6 * abstract *; | [I]WO2007093367 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [I] 1,5,6 * abstract *; | [I]EP2110557 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [I] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0009]; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US2011255952 (WILLIAMS CARNELL E [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-6; | [I]WO2014030248 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1,5,6* abstract *; | [I]WO2014033878 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1,5,6 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2001289197 | JP2010270641 |