EP3118265 - CONDUCTIVE TRANSPARENT COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | For all designated states Henkel IP & Holding GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states Henkel IP & Holding GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCIA MIRALLES, Jose Kronenstrasse 61 40217 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
SALHI, Fouad Carrer d'Argentina 23 Sant Cugat del Valles 08195 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
ESTRUGA, Marc Joan Vinyoli 20 Castellar del Valles 08211 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
ALMARZA MARTINEZ, Albert C/ Industria, n° 360, 2n 1a 08027 Barcelona / ES | 05 /
DE MENDIZABAL ZALAIKIN, Julen C/ Nicaragua 106 6 3 08029 Barcelona / ES | [2017/03] | Application number, filing date | 15176609.4 | 14.07.2015 | [2017/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3118265 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
C09D5/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08K7/06 (KR,US);
C09D133/066 (EP,KR,US);
C09D133/10 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C09D7/65 (EP,US);
C09D7/70 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2003/0806 (KR,US);
C08K2201/001 (KR,US);
C08K2201/011 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITFÄHIGE TRANSPARENTE BESCHICHTUNG | [2017/03] | English: | CONDUCTIVE TRANSPARENT COATING | [2017/03] | French: | REVÊTEMENT ELECTROCONDUCTEUR TRANSPARENT | [2017/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 16.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009108304 (CAMBRIOS TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 13 * * page 4, line 23 - page 6, line 25 * * page 11, line 15 - page 13, line 27 * * page 15, line 25 - page 18, line 16 ** abstract *; | [X]WO2009152146 (UNIDYM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * * abstract *; | [X]WO2011115603 (CARESTREAM HEALTH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 28 * * page 6, line 24 - page 8, line 31 * * page 17, line 3 - page 20, line 11 * * abstract *; | [X]WO2012083082 (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 18 * * page 12, line 31 - page 13, line 25 * * page 17, line 8 - line 24 * * abstract *; | [X]WO2012161899 (CARESTREAM HEALTH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 1, line 4 - page 3, line 19 * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 22 * * page 6, line 1 - line 14 * * abstract *; | [X]WO2013142440 (SEASHELL TECHNOLOGY LLC [US]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0066] * * abstract *; | [X]WO2013192437 (C3NANO INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * page 2, line 2 - line 24 * * page 12, line 7 - page 13, line 26 * * page 16, line 17 - page 19, line 11 * * abstract *; | [X]CN103909257 (NANXIONG MATERIAL PRODUCTION BASE GUANGZHOU CHEMICAL CO LTD OF CAS, et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * |