EP3118175 - TRIM ELEMENT FOR INTERIOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Avenue Jean Monnet 4 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTELET, Claire 12A rue du Croissant 1060 Saint-Gilles / BE | 02 /
HUMBLET, Pïerre Clos de la Fontaine 8 1380 Ohain / BE | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Chabou, Samia AGC Glass Europe Technovation Centre IP Department Rue Louis Blériot, 12 6041 Gosselies / BE | [2017/03] | Application number, filing date | 15177303.3 | 17.07.2015 | [2017/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3118175 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/087, C03C4/02 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
C03C3/087 (EP,US);
B32B17/00 (US);
B32B17/10 (US);
C03C15/00 (US);
C03C17/23 (US);
C03C17/30 (US);
C03C17/3657 (US);
C03C17/3668 (US);
C03C23/007 (US);
C03C3/066 (US);
C03C3/085 (US);
C03C4/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2017/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKLEIDUNGSELEMENT FÜR FAHRZEUGINNENRAUM | [2017/03] | English: | TRIM ELEMENT FOR INTERIOR VEHICLE | [2017/03] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'HABILLAGE INTÉRIEUR DE VÉHICULE | [2017/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 01.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2010081142 (FISKER AUTOMOTIVE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5-8,10,15 * paragraph [0005] * * claim 4 * * paragraph [0007] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 2-4 [I] 9,11-14; | [YD]WO2015011044 (AGC GLASS EUROPE [BE], et al) [YD] 2-4 * page 1, paragraph 3; example - * | by applicant | WO2014128016 | WO2014180679 | WO2015011040 | WO2015011041 | WO2015011042 | WO2015011043 | WO2015011044 | EP20130198454 | EP20150172780 | EP20150172779 | EP20140167942 | EP20140177487 |