EP3121141 - GUIDE RAIL FOR A LIFT FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osmanbasic, Faruk Kirchbühl 8 5643 Sins / CH | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 15177558.2 | 20.07.2015 | [2017/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3121141 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B66B7/02 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
B66B7/023 (EP);
B66B7/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSSCHIENE FÜR EINE AUFZUGSANLAGE | [2017/04] | English: | GUIDE RAIL FOR A LIFT FACILITY | [2017/04] | French: | RAIL DE GUIDAGE POUR UN ASCENSEUR | [2017/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 31.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]ES2356204 (ORONA S COOP [ES]) [X] 1-8 * abstract *; | [X]WO2012087295 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]CN203806903U (MARAZZI JIANGSU ELEVATOR GUIDE RAIL CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |