EP2977851 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DOCUMENT AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemia Identity & Security France 2, Place Samuel de Champlain 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2019/03] |
Former [2016/04] | For all designated states Morpho 11 Boulevard Gallieni 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Eric c/o MORPHO 11 boulevard Gallieni 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | 02 /
RIEUL, François c/o MORPHO 11 boulevard Gallieni 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | 03 /
COUTURIER, Lauriane c/o MORPHO 11 boulevard Gallieni 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | 04 /
JARLEGAN, Marie c/o MORPHO 11 boulevard Gallieni 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | 05 /
CHASTEL, Pierre c/o MORPHO 11 boulevard Gallieni 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | 06 /
BOUATOU, Vincent c/o MORPHO 11 boulevard Gallieni 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 87 rue de Sèze 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | Regimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15177632.5 | 21.07.2015 | [2016/04] | Priority number, date | FR20140056998 | 21.07.2014 Original published format: FR 1456998 | [2016/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2977851 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G06F3/01, G07C9/00, G02B27/01, G06K7/10 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
H04W12/33 (EP,US);
B42D25/00 (US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G02B27/0172 (US);
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06F3/012 (EP,US);
G06F3/0317 (EP,US);
G06K7/10821 (EP,US);
G07D7/12 (EP,US);
G07D7/20 (EP,US);
H04W12/108 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUTHENTIFIZIEREN EINES DOKUMENTS | [2016/04] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DOCUMENT AUTHENTICATION | [2016/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'AUTHENTIFICATION DE DOCUMENT | [2016/04] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 27.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 23.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6172657 (KAMAKURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9-11,13,16 * column 17, line 63 - column 18, line 42; figure 18a * [Y] 3,5,8,12,14,15; | [IY]US2012200601 (OSTERHOUT RALPH F [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0582] * [Y] 3,5,8,12,14,15; | [XI]US2013069985 (WONG ADRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9 * paragraphs [0039] - [0040] - [0 47] - [0054] * [I] 3-6; | [A]US2014125558 (MIYAJIMA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0009] - [0014] *; | [IP]WO2014198945 (SITA INFORMATION NETWORKING COMPUTING IRELAND LTD [IE]) [IP] 1-16* the whole document * |