EP2985697 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING ROUTER PLUG-IN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2016/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Tiejun Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No.68 Qinghe Middle Street 100085 Haidian District / CN | 02 /
LI, Zheng Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No.68 Qinghe Middle Street 100085 Haidian District / CN | 03 /
CHENG, Liang Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No.68 Qinghe Middle Street 100085 Haidian District / CN | 04 /
JIA, Yuehua Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No.68 Qinghe Middle Street 100085 Haidian District / CN | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15178358.6 | 24.07.2015 | [2016/07] | Priority number, date | CN201410394982 | 12.08.2014 Original published format: CN201410394982 | [2016/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2985697 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/48 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
G06F9/485 (EP);
G06F16/9038 (CN);
G06F16/00 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2016/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES ROUTER-PLUG-IN | [2016/07] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING ROUTER PLUG-IN | [2016/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER UN ROUTEUR ENFICHABLE | [2016/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 06.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 13.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008295114 (ARGADE PRAMOD VASANT [US], et al) [X] 1,7-9,11-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0066] , [0105] , [0111] , [0156] , [0158] , [0159]; figures 7,16 * [Y] 2-6,10; | [Y]US5938722 (JOHNSON WILLIAM J [US]) [Y] 2-6,10 * abstract * * column 6, line 44 - line 45 * * column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 1 * |