EP3124675 - WASHING AND/OR DRYING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIAN, Alessandro Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 02 /
SANTAROSSA, Marco Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 03 /
GIOVANNETTI, Andrea Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 04 /
DAL BEN, Diego Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/05] | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 15178430.3 | 27.07.2015 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3124675 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/12, D06F25/00 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
D06F39/12 (EP,CN,US);
D06F58/20 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2017/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHMASCHINE UND/ODER TROCKNER | [2017/05] | English: | WASHING AND/OR DRYING APPLIANCE | [2017/05] | French: | LAVE-LINGE ET/OU SÈCHE-LINGE | [2017/05] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 17.08.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP2778279 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4692987 (CUTHBERT VICTOR W [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6,11,13,14 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 53; figures 1, 2, 4, 6 *; | [A]EP2248937 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-3,9-11,13,14 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0070]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0095]; figure 12 * | by applicant | WO2012062896 | EP2778279 |