EP3018501 - SYSTEMS, TRANSMITTER ASSEMBLIES, AND ASSOCIATED PROPULSION DEVICES TO EXPLORE AND ANALYZE SUBTERRANEAN GEOPHYSICAL FORMATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company 1 Eastern Avenue Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamal, Rami Ahmed 5181 Marple Dhahran Mail Camp Saudi Aramco 31311 / SA | 02 /
Sanni, Modiu L. P. O. Box 13820 Dhahran 31311 / SA | 03 /
Kanj, Mazen Y. P. O. Box 9892 Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Dauncey, Mark Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2018/27] |
Former [2016/19] | Atkinson, Peter Birch Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15179146.4 | 12.03.2010 | [2016/19] | Priority number, date | US20090159943P | 13.03.2009 Original published format: US 159943 P | US20100722357 | 11.03.2010 Original published format: US 722357 | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3018501 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3018501 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/12, G01V11/00, E21B47/09, H02J7/00 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
G01V11/00 (EP,US);
E21B47/09 (US);
E21B47/13 (US);
E21B47/138 (EP,US);
G01V11/002 (US);
H02J7/0042 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/19] | G01V11/00, E21B47/12, H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2016/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME, SENDERANORDNUNGEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNGEN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG UND ANALYSE UNTERIRDISCHER GEOPHYSIKALISCHER FORMATIONEN | [2016/19] | English: | SYSTEMS, TRANSMITTER ASSEMBLIES, AND ASSOCIATED PROPULSION DEVICES TO EXPLORE AND ANALYZE SUBTERRANEAN GEOPHYSICAL FORMATIONS | [2016/19] | French: | SYSTÈMES, ENSEMBLES D'ÉMETTEURS, ET DES DISPOSITIFS DE PROPULSION ASSOCIÉS POUR EXPLORER ET ANALYSER DES FORMATIONS GÉOPHYSIQUES SOUTERRAINES | [2016/19] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 29.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 10.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10713536.0 / EP2406666 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor | 24.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2010 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | IT | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | PT | 04.11.2018 | IE | 12.03.2019 | LU | 12.03.2019 | MT | 12.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.03.2010 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
MT | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
MT | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
MT | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6443228 (ARONSTAM PETER [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 9, line 57 - column 10, lines 12-34, 61-68 *; | [Y]WO03089757 (SOFITECH NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [00 8] - [0011] *; | [Y]US2005055162 (GAO LI [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0 23] , [0 24] *; | [Y]US2008252479 (MATHISZIK HOLGER [DE]) [Y] 1,2* abstract *; | [Y] - SAUDI ARAMCO, "Nano Resbots: Navigating the Reservoirs of Tomorrow", INTERNET CITATION, (20080603), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.rigzone.com/news/article.asp?a_id=57957, (20100525), XP002584398 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [Y] - PETER HANGGI ET AL, "Artificial Brownian motors: Controlling transport on the nanoscale", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20080708), doi:10.1103/REVMODPHYS.81.387, XP080425903 [Y] 2,4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/RevModPhys.81.387 |