EP2983301 - SPLIT DIVERSITY DATA COMBINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Hong c/o NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property & Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, RH1 1SH / GB | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Lee, Candice Jane NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2019/46] |
Former [2016/06] | Terblanche, Candice Jane NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 15179261.1 | 31.07.2015 | [2016/06] | Priority number, date | US201414453309 | 06.08.2014 Original published format: US201414453309 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2983301 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2983301 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/02, H04B7/08 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
H04B7/0837 (EP,US);
H04B7/0413 (US);
H04B1/7115 (US);
H04B7/022 (US);
H04L27/2647 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2016/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMBINATION VON DATEN MIT GETEILTER DIVERSITÄT | [2016/06] | English: | SPLIT DIVERSITY DATA COMBINING | [2016/06] | French: | COMBINAISON DE DONNÉES DE DIVERSITÉ FENDUE | [2016/06] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.05.2019 | 15.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2015 | AL | 13.11.2019 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | ES | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | IT | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | NL | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | RS | 13.11.2019 | SE | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | NO | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | GB | 31.07.2020 | IE | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | LU | 31.07.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.07.2015 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
GB | 31.07.2020 | ||
IE | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
GB | 31.07.2020 | ||
IE | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
GB | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
GB | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
LU | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 13.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005243756 (CLEVELAND JOSEPH R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0047] *; | [A]US2008285533 (BENGTSSON HENRIK [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0069] *; | [XYI]US2009170455 (BOWEN TOBY JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,11,14 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045]; figures 3-6 * [Y] 2-4,6,9,10,12,13,15 [I] 5,7,8; | [A]US2010062802 (AMRAM NOAM [IL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0187] - paragraph [0191] *; | [Y]US2012231739 (CHEN YU [CN], et al) [Y] 2-4,6,9,10,12,13,15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0051]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2014148093 (NGUYEN NAM [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |