EP2982948 - ALIGNMENT DEVICE AND TRANSMITTER/RECEIVER SYSTEM WITH TWO ANGULAR DEGREES OF FREEDOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Servomex Group Limited Jarvis Brook Crowborough East Sussex TN6 3FB / GB | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GASKIN, Ian C 110 Powdermill Lane Royal Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN4 9DU / GB | 02 /
HOBBY, James D Wealden Eridge Road Crowborough, East Sussex TN6 2SR / GB | 03 /
KOVACICH, Richard P 5 Shrublands Cottages Coopers Wood Crowborough, East Sussex TN6 1SP / GB | 04 /
LOPEZ, Martin Picton Argos Hill Rotherfield, East Sussex TN6 3QH / GB | 05 /
TERRY, Graham R The Briars Crowborough Hill Crowborough, East Sussex TN6 2JA / GB | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Michael John, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | Jennings, Michael John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15179852.7 | 05.08.2015 | [2016/06] | Priority number, date | GB20140014081 | 08.08.2014 Original published format: GB 201414081 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2982948 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2982948 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/02, G02B7/00 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
G01J3/0202 (EP,GB,US);
G02B7/003 (US);
G01B11/272 (US);
G01J3/0289 (EP,GB,US);
G01J3/10 (GB);
G01J3/42 (EP,GB,US);
G01N21/39 (GB,US);
G02B27/0006 (US);
G02B27/62 (US);
G02B7/004 (EP,US);
G01N2201/06113 (US);
G01N2201/068 (US);
G02B7/023 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2016/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSRICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SENDER/EMPFÄNGER-MIT ZWEI WINKELFREIHEITSGRADEN | [2016/06] | English: | ALIGNMENT DEVICE AND TRANSMITTER/RECEIVER SYSTEM WITH TWO ANGULAR DEGREES OF FREEDOM | [2016/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIGNEMENT ET SYSTÈME D'ÉMETTEUR/RÉCEPTEUR AVEC DEUX DEGRÉS DE LIBERTÉ | [2016/06] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3262360 (GRUNER HEINZ E R, et al); | [XI]US3433569 (FRANCIS ARTHUR B); | [XI]GB2005862 (TAK SAU LO A); | [XI]US4655548 (JUE SUEY [US]); | [I]US4787750 (NELSON ROBERT L [US], et al); | [Y]EP1189091 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [CH]); | [A]US2003053048 (BENNETT ROBERT [GB], et al); | [I]US2008180819 (WANG XIWEN [US]); | [IY]CN103868599 (YUAN GUOBING) |