EP2988156 - SOCKET, ADAPTOR, AND ASSEMBLY JIG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROSE, Yutaka c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Yoshihisa c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
MORI, Hiroyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
SATO, Taichi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
SAWADA, Yoshihide c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
TANAKA, Tsuyoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/08] | Application number, filing date | 15180724.5 | 12.08.2015 | [2016/08] | Priority number, date | JP20140169405 | 22.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014169405 | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2988156 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2988156 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/34, B01L3/00, G01N1/28, G01N21/27, H01L27/14, H04N5/225, B25B11/02 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
G02B21/34 (EP,US);
G02B21/361 (CN);
H01R13/64 (US);
B01L9/52 (EP,US);
F16M11/046 (US);
F16M11/10 (US);
G02B21/0008 (EP,US);
H01L27/14623 (EP,US);
H01L27/14818 (EP,US);
H01R13/639 (US);
H01R13/73 (US);
H04N1/0315 (EP,US);
H04N1/0318 (EP,US);
H04N23/57 (EP,US);
H04N25/71 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2016/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STECKDOSE, ADAPTER UND MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG | [2016/08] | English: | SOCKET, ADAPTOR, AND ASSEMBLY JIG | [2016/08] | French: | DOUILLE, ADAPTATEUR ET GABARIT D'ASSEMBLAGE | [2016/08] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 11.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/30] | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5414556 (FOCHT DANIEL C [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line l * * figures 1-6,12 *; | [A]EP1171761 (CYTOLOGIX CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0106] * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US2010126005 (HE YUN-FENG [CN], et al) [A] 14 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0035] ** figures 1A, 1B, 2 *; | [X]US2011096157 (FINE ALAN MARC [CA], et al) [X] 12,13 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | JPS62137037 |