EP2991462 - EARTHING ARRANGEMENT FOR ELECTRICAL PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2020/09] |
Former [2016/09] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richardson, John c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
Broughton, Paul c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15180860.7 | 13.08.2015 | [2016/09] | Priority number, date | GB20140014963 | 22.08.2014 Original published format: GB 201414963 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991462 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2991462 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H05K1/0218 (EP,US);
H05K5/0026 (US);
G01R29/0835 (US);
H01R13/648 (US);
H05K1/0216 (US);
H05K1/028 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/09] | H05K1/02, H05K1/14, H05K3/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2016/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ERDUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR ELEKTRISCHE TAFEL | [2016/09] | English: | EARTHING ARRANGEMENT FOR ELECTRICAL PANEL | [2016/09] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE MISE À LA TERRE POUR PANNEAU ÉLECTRIQUE | [2016/09] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.12.2022 | AT | 07.12.2022 | CZ | 07.12.2022 | DK | 07.12.2022 | EE | 07.12.2022 | ES | 07.12.2022 | FI | 07.12.2022 | HR | 07.12.2022 | IT | 07.12.2022 | LT | 07.12.2022 | LV | 07.12.2022 | MC | 07.12.2022 | NL | 07.12.2022 | PL | 07.12.2022 | RO | 07.12.2022 | RS | 07.12.2022 | SE | 07.12.2022 | SI | 07.12.2022 | SK | 07.12.2022 | SM | 07.12.2022 | NO | 07.03.2023 | GR | 08.03.2023 | IS | 07.04.2023 | PT | 10.04.2023 | IE | 13.08.2023 | LU | 13.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
IT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
IE | 13.08.2023 | ||
LU | 13.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
IT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
LU | 13.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
LU | 13.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
LU | 13.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 07.12.2022 | |
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 07.12.2022 | |
NO | 07.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2272107 (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]) [Y] 2,6,7,9 * page 10, line 16 - page 13, line 3; figure - *; | [Y]EP0835045 (MOLEX INC [US]) [Y] 8 * column 3, line 21 - column 5, line 3; figure - *; | [Y]JP2006019345 (SUMITOMO ELEC PRINTED CIRCUITS) [Y] 1,3-5,10-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046]; figure - *; | [A]JP2006229157 (TATSUTA SYSTEM ELECTRONICS KK) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0039]; figure - *; | [XYI]US2010289706 (HSIEH TSUNG-YING [TW], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0080]; figure - * [Y] 2,6-9 [I] 3-5,10-15; | [A]EP2607666 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0100]; figure - *; | [A]EP2607660 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0115]; figure - *; | [A]EP2607659 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0138]; figure - *; | [Y]US2013343020 (HE QINGQING [CN], et al) [Y] 1-5,10-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0064]; figure - *; | [A]EP2743477 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0120]; figure - * | Examination | US2007149008 | US2013160461 |