EP2993875 - COVER DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING THE COVER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/40] |
Former [2016/10] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kyu-Nam Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
SEO, Su-Hyeon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/15] |
Former [2016/10] | 01 /
KIM, Kyu-Nam Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
SEO, Su-Hyeon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2016/10] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15180893.8 | 13.08.2015 | [2016/10] | Priority number, date | KR20140116247 | 02.09.2014 Original published format: KR 20140116247 | [2016/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2993875 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2993875 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/04, H04M1/18, H04M1/725 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
H04M1/04 (EP);
H04M1/724092 (EP,US);
H04M1/185 (EP);
H04M1/7246 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2016/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABDECKUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT ABDECKUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/10] | English: | COVER DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING THE COVER DEVICE | [2016/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUVERTURE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPORTANT LE DISPOSITIF DE COUVERCLE | [2016/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2015 | AL | 03.10.2018 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | ES | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | IT | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | MT | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 13.08.2015 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.08.2015 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NO | 03.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1098543 (GUALA DISPENSING SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0015] *; | [Y]WO2013150192 (SMART PACKAGING SOLUTIONS SPS [FR]) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, line 3 - page 4, line 10 ** page 5, line 2 - page 9, line 21 * |